Gills v. C Verizon Corp
Plaintiff: Heidi Ann Gills
Defendant: Cellco Partnership and Verizon Corp
Case Number: 1:2017cv01415
Filed: October 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT adopting 39 Report and Recommendations.; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 4/13/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING - Diversity jurisdiction is established. No further action is necessary at this time. This finding is preliminary in nature and may be reconsidered sua sponte or upon appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/28/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/7/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gills v. C Verizon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Ann Gills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Michael L Cohen
Represented By: W Evan Plauche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?