Price v. City of Alexandria et al
Plaintiff: |
Tonya Price |
Defendant: |
City of Alexandria, Jacques Roy, City Council Alexandria, Adam Dupuy, X Y Z Insurance Co, Quick Track Asset Recovery L L C, Tony Lear, Ajay McGraw, Loren Lampert and Police Dept of Alexandria |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv01569 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Alexandria Office |
County: |
Acadia |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark L Hornsby |
Presiding Judge: |
James T Trimble |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 18, 2018 |
Filing
18
JUDGMENT adopting 17 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that this civil action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/18/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM ORDER re 11 MOTION to Withdraw Carol D. Powell Lexing as Attorney filed by Tonya Price. Plaintiff is strongly encouraged to retain new counsel. She is granted until April 9, 2018 to either (1) enroll new counsel to r epresent her in this case or (2) file with the court a written statement that she intends to represent herself. Failure to take one of these steps by April 9, 2018 may result in Plaintiff's case being dismissed, without further notice, for failu re to prosecute. If Plaintiff elects to represent herself, she is responsible for complying with applicable deadlines and rules. The court and its staff cannot give legal advice to a party. Copies of the rules are located on the court's website: www.lawd.uscourts.gov. The Clerk of Court is instructed to (1) send a copy of this order to Plaintiff at the address reflected on the certified mail receipt filed as Exhibit A Doc. 13 to the Motion to Withdraw: 5314 Airview Road, Alexandria, LA 71 302, and modify the docket sheet so that Plaintiff will receive all future notices issued by this court at that address. Plaintiff is obligated to advise the Clerk of Court in writing of any changes to her address. If mail is returned, it may result in the case being dismissed. Compliance Deadline set for 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/9/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Price v. City of Alexandria et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: City of Alexandria |
Represented By: |
Joshua J Dara, Jr |
Represented By: |
Michael J O'Shee |
Represented By: |
Steven M Oxenhandler |
Represented By: |
Sam N Poole, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jacques Roy |
Represented By: |
Joshua J Dara, Jr |
Represented By: |
Michael J O'Shee |
Represented By: |
Steven M Oxenhandler |
Represented By: |
Sam N Poole, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: City Council Alexandria |
Represented By: |
Joshua J Dara, Jr |
Represented By: |
Michael J O'Shee |
Represented By: |
Steven M Oxenhandler |
Represented By: |
Sam N Poole, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Adam Dupuy |
Represented By: |
Joshua J Dara, Jr |
Represented By: |
Michael J O'Shee |
Represented By: |
Steven M Oxenhandler |
Represented By: |
Sam N Poole, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Quick Track Asset Recovery L L C |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tony Lear |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ajay McGraw |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Loren Lampert |
Represented By: |
Joshua J Dara, Jr |
Represented By: |
Michael J O'Shee |
Represented By: |
Steven M Oxenhandler |
Represented By: |
Sam N Poole, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Police Dept of Alexandria |
Represented By: |
Joshua J Dara, Jr |
Represented By: |
Michael J O'Shee |
Represented By: |
Steven M Oxenhandler |
Represented By: |
Sam N Poole, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Tonya Price |
Represented By: |
Carol D Powell-Lexing |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?