Louisiana et al v. B E P C O L P et al
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Defendant: B E P C O L P, B O P C O L P, Chisholm Trail Ventures L P and Hess Corp
Case Number: 1:2018cv00551
Filed: April 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT IT IS ORDERED that the Court adopts the result but not the balance of the 56 Report and Recommendations, denying 14 and 16 motion to dismiss as moot and remanding this matter to the 19th JDC for the Parish of East Baton Rouge. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 8/12/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT adopting 53 Report and Recommendations, denying 11 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 3/25/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RULING Adopting 38 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; ; granting 12 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/19/2018. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/20/2018.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana et al v. B E P C O L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B E P C O L P
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Allison Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B O P C O L P
Represented By: Michael P Cash
Represented By: Hunter A Chauvin
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Trail Ventures L P
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Allison Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corp
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Bambrick
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Robert B McNeal
Represented By: Elizabeth S Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?