Wang v. Rodriguez De Jongh et al
Plaintiff: Qiong Wang
Defendant: Lourdes RODRIGUEZ DE JONGH, John J Hartnett and Jefferson B Sessions, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv01043
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: La Salle
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Qiong Wang. John J Hartnett served on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; Lourdes Rodriguez De Jongh served on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; Jefferson B Sessions, III served on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY filed to capture answer due date for service reflected within pdf of docs. #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 . (crt,Haik, K)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on U.S. Attorney's Office Civil Process Clerk on 08/21/2018, filed by Qiong Wang. (aty,Gahagan, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on U.S. Department of Homeland Security General Counsel on 08/21/2018, filed by Qiong Wang. (aty,Gahagan, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on John J. Hartnett on 08/22/2018, filed by Qiong Wang. (aty,Gahagan, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Lourdes Rodriguez De Jongh on 08/21/2018, filed by Qiong Wang. (aty,Gahagan, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Jefferson Sessions on 08/22/2018, filed by Qiong Wang. (aty,Gahagan, Michael) Modified on 9/12/2018 to correct served on date (Haik, K).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO Magistrate Judge for Consideration and Disposition. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 8/20/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REISSUED as to U. S. Attorney General. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to John J Hartnett, Lourdes Rodriguez De Jongh, Jefferson B Sessions, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Secretary of Department of Homeland Security, #2 Summons - John J. Hartnett, Administrator, #3 Summons - United States Attorney's Office)(crt,Roaix, G)
August 19, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Qiong Wang.(aty,Gahagan, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Lourdes Rodriguez De Jongh, Jefferson B Sessions, III, John J Hartnett. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/15/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 13, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0536-3725953) filed by Qiong Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Proposed summons/writ, #5 Proposed summons/writ, #6 Proposed summons/writ, #7 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Qiong Wang(pty:pla))(aty,Gahagan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Rodriguez De Jongh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qiong Wang
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes RODRIGUEZ DE JONGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?