Reliable Amusement Co Inc v. Brunson et al
Appellant: Reliable Amusement Company Inc and Reliable Amusement Co Inc
Appellee: Ted Brett Brunson, Mark A Begnaud, John W Luster, Coastal Pipe of Louisiana Inc, Bank, Cardiovascular Surgery of Alexandria L L C, O'Nealgas Inc, Alford Motors Inc and E A Hinton Well Servicing Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv01166
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY: The hearing set for 2:00 p. m. on 10/31/18 is continued without date. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 10/31/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Ted Brett Brunson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(aty,Arceneaux, M) Modified on 10/12/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying #12 Motion to Expedite; denying #12 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 10/10/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Roedel Parsons et al, Steffes Firm L L C. (aty,Parsons, Barbara)
October 4, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal with opposition, MOTION to Expedite, MOTION to Bifurcate. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal with opposition , MOTION to Expedite , MOTION to Bifurcate with certificate of service by Ted Brett Brunson. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Arceneaux, M)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Order Allowing Participation in Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/27/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Responses due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/26/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Barbara B Parsons on behalf of Roedel Parsons et al, Steffes Firm L L C, indicating Consent (aty,Parsons, Barbara)
September 26, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Allowing Participation in Oral Argument re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Allowing Participation in Oral Argument re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Coastal Pipe of Louisiana Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Aguillard, H) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
September 25, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal with consent sought but not yet obtained . Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Responses by T. Brett Brunson due by 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/25/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal with consent sought but not yet obtained by The Steffes Firm, LLC, Roedel, Parsons, Koch, Blache, Balhoffe & Mccollister. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Parsons, Barbara) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
September 24, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal with consent with Certificate of Service. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal with consent with Certificate of Service by Ted Brett Brunson. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Arceneaux, M)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Hearing Motion day set for 10/31/2018 at 02:00 PM in xAlexandria Court House before Judge Dee D Drell. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/20/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 19, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #3 MOTION Request for Oral Argument re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Request for Oral Argument re #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Reliable Amusement Co Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Lewis, Sara) Modified on 9/20/2018 to edit event (FinnSld, P).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Hearing as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal, Motion day set for 10/12/2018 before Judge Dee D Drell. ( Responses due by 9/26/2018) Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/12/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 5, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 5, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Reliable Amusement Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 AP Notice of Appeal, #5 AP Order Appealed, #6 AP Docket Sheet)(crt,Welch, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reliable Amusement Co Inc v. Brunson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Reliable Amusement Company Inc
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Represented By: Paul E Bullington
Represented By: Sara M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Reliable Amusement Co Inc
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Represented By: Paul E Bullington
Represented By: Sara M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ted Brett Brunson
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Represented By: Rebecca Sparger Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark A Begnaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John W Luster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Coastal Pipe of Louisiana Inc
Represented By: H Kent Aguillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank
Represented By: Gayle Thomasson Busch
Represented By: William E Steffes
Represented By: W L West
Represented By: Barbara B Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cardiovascular Surgery of Alexandria L L C
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: O'Nealgas Inc
Represented By: Gayle Thomasson Busch
Represented By: William E Steffes
Represented By: W L West
Represented By: Barbara B Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alford Motors Inc
Represented By: Gayle Thomasson Busch
Represented By: William E Steffes
Represented By: W L West
Represented By: Barbara B Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: E A Hinton Well Servicing Inc
Represented By: Gayle Thomasson Busch
Represented By: William E Steffes
Represented By: W L West
Represented By: Barbara B Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?