Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dole, MD, A Professional Medical Corporation and Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma and Alex M Azar
Case Number: 1:2018cv01198
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Putch, A)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Alex M Azar, Seema Verma. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(crt,Putch, A)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limitation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/8/2018. (crt,Putch, A) Modified on 11/9/2018 to capture proper file date (Putch, A).
November 6, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Writ of Mandamus MOTION to Consolidate Case with opposition filed by Alex M Azar, Seema Verma. (aty,King, Karen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess Pages by Alex M Azar, Seema Verma. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,King, Karen) Modified on 11/7/2018 to create link to #17 Proposed Pleading (Putch, A).
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , PROPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Mandamus regarding #18 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess Pages by Alex M Azar, Seema Verma. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (aty,King, Karen) Modified on 11/7/2018 to reflect as proposed pleading to #18 Motion for Leave (Putch, A).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Writ of Mandamus MOTION to Consolidate Case with opposition . Responses due by 11/6/2018 Replies due by 11/13/2018.. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 11/5/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 1, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #15 JOINT MOTION to Modify Briefing Scheduling Order. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Putch, A)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION to Modify Briefing Scheduling Order regarding #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Permanent Injunction, for Writ of Mandamus and to Consolidate Case with consent by All Parties. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Karen J King added to Alex M Azar and Seema Verma)(aty,King, Karen) Modified on 11/2/2018 to edit text and filers (Putch, A).
October 22, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Writ of Mandamus MOTION to Consolidate Case with opposition . Motion day set for 11/16/2018 10:30 AM in Alexandria, 2nd floor before Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 18, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Permanent Injunction , MOTION for Writ of Mandamus , MOTION to Consolidate Case with opposition by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Thomas, Jennifer)
October 16, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Jennifer Jones Thomas on behalf of Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp regarding #13 Affidavit of Service. Action taken: Modified to reflect executed due to Administrative error and to capture answer due date on 10/16/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Jennifer Jones Thomas on behalf of Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp regarding #13 Affidavit of Service. Action taken: Action taken: docket text modified to reflect Summons Returned Unexecuted - Service of the complaint is not considered properly executed (service within the State of Louisiana cannot be effected through certified mail); therefore answer deadline has been terminated and serviced executed date removed. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Returned Executed - filed as AFFIDAVIT of Service served on David C. Joseph on 9/14/18, answer due 11/13/2018, filed by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (aty,Thomas, Jennifer) Modified to reflect unexecuted on 10/12/2018 (Bunting, M). Modified to reflect executed due to Administrative error and to capture answer due date on 10/16/2018 (Bunting, M).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Issue Briefing Order and for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Plaintiff shall file brief in support for its request for preliminary and permanent injunction and/or relief under the Mandamus Act on or before 10/19/2018. Defendants shall file response on or before 11/2/2018. Plaintiff may file reply on or before 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 10/3/2018. (crt,Putch, A)
October 3, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #11 CONSENT MOTION to Issue Briefing Order, MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Putch, A)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT MOTION to Issue Briefing Order, MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum with consent by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Thomas, Jennifer) Modified on 10/3/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Alex Azar (for U S Dept of Health & Human Services) on 09/27/2018, filed by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (aty,Thomas, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Jeff Sessions (for U S Attorney General) on 09/20/18, filed by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (aty,Thomas, Jennifer) Modified on 9/28/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Robert P. Charrow (for U S Dept of Health & Human Services) on 09/19/18, filed by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (aty,Thomas, Jennifer)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Seema Verma (for Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services) on 09/17/18, filed by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (aty,Thomas, Jennifer) Modified on 9/21/2018 to capture proper service date as reflected on green card (Putch, A).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. Set Hearing as to #1 Complaint for injunctive relief and mandamus : Hearing set for 11/16/2018 10:30 AM in Alexandria, 2nd floor before Judge Dee D Drell. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/17/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/13/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (crt,Putch, A)
September 11, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Putch, A)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (aty,Rodrigue, Linda) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Alex M Azar, Seema Verma, submitted by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons/writ, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Proposed summons/writ, #5 Proposed summons/writ, #6 Proposed summons/writ)(aty,Rodrigue, Linda) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MANDAMUS against Alex M Azar, Seema Verma (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3750594) filed by Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Linda G Rodrigue added to party Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp(pty:pla))(aty,Rodrigue, Linda) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dole, MD, A Professional Medical Corporation
Represented By: Linda G Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dole M D A Professional Medical Corp
Represented By: Bradley C Myers
Represented By: Jennifer Jones Thomas
Represented By: Linda G Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Karen J King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar
Represented By: Karen J King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?