Hill et al v. Geo Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Hansen Stringer, Theresa Mitchell, Wylie Barham, Memory Shriner, Verna Bertrand, Charlene Paul, Kenneth Hill, Marli Hudnall and Mylinda Riddle
Defendant: David Cole, CPT Operating Partnership LP, Geo Group Inc and C P T Operating Partnership L P
Case Number: 1:2018cv01363
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 1/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor Courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/13/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 10, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #11 PROPOSED Plan of Work. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Wylie Barham, Verna Bertrand, Kenneth Hill, Marli Hudnall, Theresa Mitchell, Charlene Paul, Mylinda Riddle, Memory Shriner, Hansen Stringer, C P T Operating Partnership L P, David Cole and Geo Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Willeford, James) Modified on 12/10/2018 to correctly identify document, create motion event and add filers (Dauterive, C).
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by C P T Operating Partnership L P, David Cole, Geo Group Inc . (aty,Gabb, Samuel)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by C P T Operating Partnership L P, David Cole, Geo Group Inc.(aty,Gabb, Samuel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C P T Operating Partnership L P identifying Corporate Parent Geo Group Inc for C P T Operating Partnership L P. (aty,Gabb, Samuel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Geo Group Inc. (aty,Gabb, Samuel)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/19/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record, (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 12/17/2018.).(crt,Roaix, G)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/19/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Samuel B Gabb on behalf of CPT Operating Partnership LP, Geo Group Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/1/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 18, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 28th JDC LaSalle Parish, Case Number 41065 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3783557) filed by CPT Operating Partnership LP, David Cole, Geo Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition)(Attorney Samuel B Gabb added to party CPT Operating Partnership LP(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel B Gabb added to party David Cole(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel B Gabb added to party Geo Group Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Gabb, Samuel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/18/2018) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Geo Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hansen Stringer
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Mitchell
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wylie Barham
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memory Shriner
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Bertrand
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Paul
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hill
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marli Hudnall
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mylinda Riddle
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: Mark J Neal
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Nicholas A Holton
Represented By: Arthur L Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cole
Represented By: Samuel B Gabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT Operating Partnership LP
Represented By: Samuel B Gabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Group Inc
Represented By: Samuel B Gabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C P T Operating Partnership L P
Represented By: Samuel B Gabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?