Johnson v. ICE et al
Plaintiff: Vaughn Johnson
Defendant: R B P F Inter-agencies, I C E and U S C I S
Case Number: 1:2018cv01484
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #22 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/4/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Pertinent District Court Cases by Vaughn Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The Court takes note of Petitioner's new address. Petitioner's remaining requests for relief are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/17/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #18 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/17/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Apprise Court of new address and to Incorporate Bill of Rights, Constitutional, Non-Detention Act, Statutory Privacy Act, 1st, 4th, 5th, 6th, and 14th Amendment Fundamental Procedural Safeguard Equal Protection Due Process Clause Crisis Concerns Violations by Vaughn Johnson. (Plaintiff's address previously updated to Etowah County Jail.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File an Instant Addendum Order to Take Judicial Notice for Relief to Incorporate Substantive Prejudice into Petitioner's Complaint by Vaughn Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Vaughn Johnson, LaSalle Detention Facility P O Box 560 Trout, LA 71371, re: 13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief returned marked: Return to Sender, no longer here. Clerk resent to plaintiff at Etowah County Jail (crt,Haik, K) Modified to indicate clerk resent document to plaintiff at current address on 12/17/2018 (Haik, K).
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion for Leave. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. Petitioner's remaining requests for relief are denied as premature or unwarranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/12/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Vaughn Johnson, LaSalle Detention Facility P O Box 560 Trout, LA 71371, re: #12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis returned marked: Return to Sender. Action taken: Clerk resent to Plaintiff at Etowah County Jail, 827 Forrest Ave, Gadsden, AL 35901. (crt,Haik, K)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to File Instant Addendum to Memorandum Order; to Retain Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Take Judicial Notice by Vaughn Johnson. (Plaintiff's address updated to Etowah County Jail on 12/7/18.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE of Change of Address by Vaughn Johnson. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to Etowah County Jail, 827 Forrest Ave Gadsden, AL 35901 per doc. 18 in 18-cv-1427. (crt,Haik, K)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/30/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/27/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION entitled "Motion for Leave to File Amend/Correct Supplement Emergency Complaint Show Cause for Injunctive Relief;Monetary Relief;Relief to Take Judicial Notice of Violations of Rights Under Non-Detention Act..." by Vaughn Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vaughn Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Vaughn Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 2241 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/15/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 14, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01871. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - At the time he brought this petition, Johnson was confined in La Salle Parish, Louisiana, which is located in the Western District of Louisiana. This court lacks jurisdiction over Johnsons immediate custodian, and thus over his petition. Accordingly, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/14/2018. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 11/14/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vaughn Johnson. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 11/14/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Vaughn Johnson.(KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 11/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. ICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R B P F Inter-agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I C E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S C I S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?