United Van Lines L L C v. Siroty
Defendant: Raina Siroty
Petitioner: United Van Lines L L C
Case Number: 1:2018cv01628
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Van Lines L L C. Raina Siroty served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (aty,Dennard, Mary)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 2/16/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/19/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raina Siroty (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 18, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raina Siroty (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3833059) filed by United Van Lines L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Mary Kerrigan Dennard added to party United Van Lines L L C(pty:pet))(aty,Dennard, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Van Lines L L C v. Siroty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United Van Lines L L C
Represented By: Mary Kerrigan Dennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raina Siroty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?