Garland v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Gene Irving Garland, Jr
Defendant: Calvin Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gene Irving Garland, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
January 24, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Gene Irving Garland, Jr in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635060849. (crt,Delgado, S)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Gene Irving Garland, Jr re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Williams, L)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 2241, #2 ifp)(crt,Haik, K)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/21/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gene Irving Garland, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) . Complaint not on approved forms.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garland v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Irving Garland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?