Thach v. Whitaker

Plaintiff: Tai Thach
Defendant: Matthew G Whitaker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00208
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to apprise court of change of address. (crt,Haik, K)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Tai Thach, LaSalle Detention Facility, 830 Pine Hill Rd, Jena LA 71342, re: 2 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (crt,Williams, L)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/22/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 54635061020, filing fee $5) filed by Tai Thach. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thach v. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tai Thach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?