Shaikh v. Jean
Plaintiff: Fahim Abdul Shaikh
Defendant: Charles W Jean
Case Number: 1:2019cv00292
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U S Attorney General. Served on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden LaSalle Detention Facility, District Director ICE. Served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U.S. Attorney. Served on 4/12/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden LaSalle Detention Facility, District Director ICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/9/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fahim Abdul Shaikh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 2241 Habeas Petition)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/8/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 6, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 14635002734, filing fee $5) filed by Fahim Abdul Shaikh. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) Complaint not on approved forms.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaikh v. Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fahim Abdul Shaikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?