Sareai v. Barr
Plaintiff: Farhan Al Sareai
Defendant: William P Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00445
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P Barr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Exhibit A1-Detention Decisions)(Attorney Cristina Walker added to party William P Barr(pty:dft))(aty,Walker, Cristina)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General. Served on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to ICE District Director. Served on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden LaSalle Detention Facility. Served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, ICE District Director, and Warden LaSalle Detention Facility. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/18/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
April 11, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Farhan Al Sareai in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635061384. (crt,Delgado, S)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/11/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Farhan Al Sareai. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sareai v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farhan Al Sareai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?