Khan v. Jean
Plaintiff: Sohail Khan
Defendant: Charles W Jean
Case Number: 1:2019cv00463
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations by Sohail Khan. Response to Objection to R&R due by 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sohail Khan. It is recommended that plaintiff's petition be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes (a) on 4/18/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/17/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/17/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sohail Khan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sohail Khan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/15/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 54635061385, filing fee $5) filed by Sohail Khan. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sohail Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?