Butte v. Barr

Plaintiff: Norman Butte
Defendant: William P Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00487
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Norman Butte, LaSalle Detention Facility, 830 Pine Hill Rd, Jena LA 71342, re: #7 MEMORANDUM ORDER returned marked: Return to Sender - No Longer Here. (crt,Williams, L)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Norman Butte, LaSalle Detention Facility, 830 Pine Hill Rd, Jena, LA 71342, re: #6 MEMORANDUM ORDER returned marked: Return to Sender - No Longer Here. (crt,Williams, L)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend petition. Pro Se Response due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/21/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/17/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/23/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/18/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Norman Butte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Norman Butte. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butte v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Butte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?