Maerz v. Avoyelles Parish
Plaintiff: Victoria Maerz
Defendant: School Board of Avoyelles Parish
Case Number: 1:2019cv00555
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 8/13/2019 at 11:15 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Counsel shall arrive ten minutes before the status conference to meet with the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/2/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Victoria Maerz, School Board of Avoyelles Parish. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Matthews, Laura) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add filer (Whidden, C).
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , by School Board of Avoyelles Parish.(aty,Bash, Lottie) Modified to remove duplicate text on 6/20/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against School Board of Avoyelles Parish with Jury Demand filed by Victoria Maerz.(crt,Bunting, M)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/6/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER mooting #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/6/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent by Victoria Maerz. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Granting Leave to Amend, #2 Proposed pleading First Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint)(aty,Reaux, Megan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by School Board of Avoyelles Parish. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Laura Beth Matthews added to party School Board of Avoyelles Parish(pty:dft))(aty,Matthews, Laura)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Victoria Maerz. School Board of Avoyelles Parish waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (aty,Reaux, Megan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 6/29/2019.) (crt,Roaix, G)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/2/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to School Board of Avoyelles Parish. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/1/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victoria Maerz. (aty,Reaux, Megan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against School Board of Avoyelles Parish with Jury Demand (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Victoria Maerz. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Megan Elizabeth Reaux added to party Victoria Maerz(pty:pla))(aty,Reaux, Megan) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 5/1/2019 (ThomasSld, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maerz v. Avoyelles Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Maerz
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Reaux
Represented By: Bret C Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Board of Avoyelles Parish
Represented By: Franklin A Hoffmann
Represented By: Laura Beth Matthews
Represented By: Lottie L Bash
Represented By: Madaline Gaile King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?