DeLeon v. Corrections

Plaintiff: Stace Adam DeLeon
Defendant: LA Dept of Corrections and James Leblanc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00599
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for each defendant to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Pro Se Response due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Service packet, #2 Service packet)(crt,Haik, K)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that re #1 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order,MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stace Adam DeLeon be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/24/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION/EXHIBITS re #1 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order,MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Stace Adam DeLeon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/13/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $35.00. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/13/2019. (crt,HaikSld, K)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/13/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Putch, A)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Putch, A)
May 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Putch, A)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00193. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/9/2019. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]
May 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Stace Adam DeLeon. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Attachment, #3 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Corrections, filed by Stace Adam DeLeon. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Induction against Louisiana Department of Corrections, filed by Stace Adam DeLeon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 declaration, #3 Order, #4 Exhibit, #5 envelope)(EDC) Modified on 4/3/2019 to change event type.(EDC). Added MOTION on 4/3/2019 (EDC). Modified on 4/3/2019 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLeon v. Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stace Adam DeLeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leblanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?