Nuria Portales Morales vs. David C Cole
Plaintiff: Nuria Portal Morales
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan, David D Rivera, William Pelham Barr and David C Cole
Petitioner: Ms NURIA PORTALES MORALES
Respondent: Warden David C Cole
Case Number: 1:2019cv00715
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Pelham Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, David D Rivera (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to David C Cole (crt,HaikSld, K)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/7/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by NURIA PORTALES MORALES. (aty,Goeke, Robert)
June 5, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - CIVIL COVER SHEET by NURIA PORTALES MORALES. (aty,Goeke, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/6/2019) (Thigpen, M). Modified to reflect resubmitted on 6/7/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #3 .
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0536-3965438) filed by NURIA PORTALES MORALES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through I Unredacted, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A thorught I Redacted, #3 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Robert William Goeke added to party NURIA PORTALES MORALES(pty:pet))(aty,Goeke, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuria Portales Morales vs. David C Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden David C Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ms NURIA PORTALES MORALES
Represented By: Robert William Goeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuria Portal Morales
Represented By: Robert William Goeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?