Mizhirumbay Tacuri vs. Crockett et al
Defendant: William Barr, Mark A Morgan, Stanley Crockett and Kevin McAleenan
Petitioner: Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri
Case Number: 1:2019cv00754
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT adopting #4 Report and Recommendations, denying #2 Motion for TRO dismissing petition for lack of jurisdiction, with prejudice as to the jurisdictional issue, but without prejudice as to the merits of Tacuri's claim. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/15/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/14/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri be DENIED and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, with prejudice s to the jurisdictional issue and without prejudice as to the merits of Tacuri's claim. Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/14/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 13, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Board's Decision and Order)(crt,Roaix, G)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Ayhan Ogmen added to party Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri(pty:pet))(crt,Roaix, G) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/14/2019) (Roaix, G). Modified on 6/14/2019 (Roaix, G) to correct the file date.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizhirumbay Tacuri vs. Crockett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Antonio Mizhirumbay Tacuri
Represented By: Ayhan Ogmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?