Anuwave L L C v. Cleco Power L L C

Plaintiff: Anuwave L L C
Defendant: Cleco Power L L C
Case Number: 1:2019cv00777
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
2 Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ricardo J Bonilla for Cleco Power L L C,Ricardo J Bonilla for Cleco Power L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/16/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Neil McNabnay for Cleco Power L L C,Neil McNabnay for Cleco Power L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/16/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #23 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs Complaint. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Neil McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4025684) by Cleco Power L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Crenshaw, Martha)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Ricardo J. Bonilla to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4025676) by Cleco Power L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Crenshaw, Martha)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs Complaint by Cleco Power L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Crenshaw, Martha)
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cleco Power L L C identifying Corporate Parent Cleco Power L L C for Cleco Power L L C. (aty,Crenshaw, Martha)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Anuwave L L C by Cleco Power L L C.(aty,Crenshaw, Martha)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/29/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Martha R. Crenshaw as Attorney of record. Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/29/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Eugenio L Torres-Oyola for Anuwave L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/26/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jean G Vidal-Font for Anuwave L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/26/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Martha R. Crenshaw in place of Thomas M. Hayes III with consent by Cleco Power L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Martha R Crenshaw added to party Cleco Power L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Crenshaw, Martha)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Eugenio L. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vicefiled by Anuwave L L C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Henderson, Joel) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 7/25/2019 (Bunting, M).
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Jean G. Vidal-Font to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anuwave L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Henderson, Joel) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 7/25/2019 (Bunting, M).
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 9/8/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency to Joel J Henderson on behalf of Anuwave L L C regarding #9 MOTION for Eugenio L. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vice
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anuwave L L C. Cleco Power L L C served on 7/8/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (aty,Henderson, Joel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - MOTION for Eugenio L. Torres-Oyola to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4000751) by Anuwave L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Henderson, Joel) Modified to reflect deficient status on 7/18/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to reflect resubmitted on 7/25/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #14 .
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - MOTION for Jean G. Vidal-Font to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4000744) by Anuwave L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Henderson, Joel) Modified to reflect deficient status on 7/18/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to reflect resubmitted on 7/25/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #13 .
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Cleco Power L L C answer due 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/16/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Cleco Power L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III added to party Cleco Power L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Hayes, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/24/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (crt,Bunting, M)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cleco Power L L C (crt,Bunting, M)
June 19, 2019 Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes added. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anuwave, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Anuwave, LLC for Anuwave, LLC. (aty,Henderson, Joel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cleco Power L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3976939) filed by Anuwave, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit '862 Patent, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Joel J Henderson added to party Anuwave, LLC(pty:selreq))(aty,Henderson, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anuwave L L C v. Cleco Power L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anuwave L L C
Represented By: Joel J Henderson
Represented By: Eugenio L Torres-Oyola
Represented By: Jean G Vidal-Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleco Power L L C
Represented By: Ricardo J Bonilla
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Represented By: Neil McNabnay
Represented By: Martha R Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?