Alexandria I L L C v. Capital One National Association
Plaintiff: Alexandria I, LLC and Alexandria I L L C
Defendant: Capital One National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00857
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Capital One National Association answer due 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/8/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent from Plaintiff's Counsel, by Capital One National Association. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Ralston, Christopher)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Capital One National Association of Compliance re #7 Removal Order (aty,Kraatz, Arthur) Modified docket text to more accurately describe document filed on 7/17/2019 (Bunting, M).
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital One National Association identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corp for Capital One National Association. (aty,Kraatz, Arthur)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Capital One National Association answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/9/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/9/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Capital One National Association. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Kraatz, Arthur)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/8/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 9/1/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Arthur Raymond Kraatz, Christopher K Ralston on behalf of Capital One National Association. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/17/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 3, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 265079 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3988580) filed by Capital One National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Arthur Raymond Kraatz added to party Capital One National Association(pty:dft))(aty,Kraatz, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexandria I L L C v. Capital One National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria I, LLC
Represented By: Nita R Gorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria I L L C
Represented By: Nita R Gorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One National Association
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Represented By: Christopher K Ralston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?