Deal v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Deal
Defendant: ABC Employee, Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC, Bloomin Brands Inc, Gallagher Bassett, Jean Mouton, Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C and A B C Employee
Case Number: 1:2019cv00904
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #22 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/5/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #22 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,JonesSld, P)
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and Proposed Order within main document by Bloomin Brands Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading)(aty,Poole, John) Modified on 9/4/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Patricia Deal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,White, Laurel)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss; all claims asserted by Patricia Deal against Gallagher-Bassett are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear own costs. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 8/19/2019. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C, Jean Mouton, Bloomin Brands Inc re #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand (aty,Poole, John) Modified on 8/19/2019 to add filer (Dunford, T).
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jean Mouton, Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C, Bloomin Brands Inc. (aty,Poole, John) Modified on 8/19/2019 to add filers (Dunford, T).
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss GALLAGHER-BASSETT by Patricia Deal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,White, Laurel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C identifying Corporate Parent O S I Restaurant Partners L L C for Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C. (aty,Poole, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll Laurel I White as Co-Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/7/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Laurel I. White to Enroll as Counsel by Patricia Deal. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Laurel I White added to party Patricia Deal(pty:pla))(aty,White, Laurel) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO #7 REMOVAL ORDER by Bloomin Brands Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Chronologically)(aty,Poole, John) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit text and add document relation (JonesSld, P).
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Motion to Remand,, Motion for Attorney Fees, by Patricia Deal . (aty,Fuller, Deirdre) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Patricia Deal. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Fuller, Deirdre). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 7/29/2019 (JonesSld, P). Modified on 7/29/2019 to add event and edit text (JonesSld, P). Modified on 7/30/2019 to indicate SEE Document #12 Proposed Order (JonesSld, P).
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Answer to Complaint, sent to Darrin L Forte, John Reed Poole, Jr on behalf of Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/6/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bloomin Brands Inc, Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C, Jean Mouton.(aty,Poole, John) Modified on 7/23/2019 to add filers (JonesSld, P).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/17/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 9/13/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/17/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Bloomin Brands Inc answer due 7/22/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Jean Mouton, Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC (Attorney John Reed Poole, Jr added to party Jean Mouton(pty:dft), Attorney John Reed Poole, Jr added to party Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC(pty:dft)). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Gallagher Bassett (Attorney T Simon Menard added to party Gallagher Bassett(pty:dft)). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Bloomin Brands Inc re #1 Notice of Removal,, State Court Notice of Removal (aty,Poole, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bloomin Brands Inc. (aty,Poole, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 265,118 "A" (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3997514) filed by Bloomin Brands Inc. (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 Affidavit Service on Bloomin Brands, #3 Exhibit Proof of Receipt USPS, #4 Exhibit Consent of Gallagher Bassett, #5 Exhibit Consent of Outback and Jean Mouton, #6 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Attorney John Reed Poole, Jr added to party Bloomin Brands Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Poole, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deal v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin Brands Inc
Represented By: John Reed Poole, Jr
Represented By: Darrin L Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett
Represented By: T Simon Menard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Mouton
Represented By: John Reed Poole, Jr
Represented By: Darrin L Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C
Represented By: John Reed Poole, Jr
Represented By: Darrin L Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Deal
Represented By: Laurel I White
Represented By: Deirdre R Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?