Murray v. D G Louisiana L L C
Plaintiff: Jordan Murray
Defendant: DG Louisiana, LLC and D G Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 1:2019cv00933
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Remand filed by D G Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical record, #2 Exhibit Pharmacy record)(aty,Turnage, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 First MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand by Jordan Murray. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, Cory)
July 29, 2019 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed 7/9/2019 by D G Louisiana L L C in 12th JDC Avoyelles Parish, Case Number 2019-6366. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #1 to #8 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Dauterive, C)
July 29, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against D G Louisiana L L C filed 6/28/2019 by Jordan Murray in 12th JDC Avoyelles Parish, Case Number 2019-6366. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #1 to #8 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by D G Louisiana L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(aty,Turnage, John)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/22/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D G Louisiana L L C. (aty,Turnage, John) Modified on 7/22/2019 to add Corporate Parents Dolgencorp L L C and Dollar General Corp (Dauterive, C).
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/22/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 9/17/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to John C Turnage on behalf of DG Louisiana, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/2/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by DG Louisiana, LLC. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 12th JDC Avoyelles Parish, Case Number 2019-6366 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4002034) filed by DG Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit Answer of DG, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery, #4 Exhibit Dr. Clement medical records, #5 Exhibit MRI, #6 Exhibit Deposition of Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal, #8 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John C Turnage added to party DG Louisiana, LLC(pty:selreq))(aty,Turnage, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. D G Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Murray
Represented By: Brandon Jude Scott
Represented By: Cory P Roy
Represented By: Benjamin David James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: John C Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D G Louisiana L L C
Represented By: John C Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?