Sexton v. Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut et al
Plaintiff: Gerry Sexton
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut, Brookshire Grocery Company, G M C Produce L L C and Brookshire Grocery Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00937
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss G-MC Produce, LLC. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 8/28/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Partially Dismiss by G M C Produce L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Potter, Russell) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 8/23/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/21/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Removal Order and Supplemental Certificate of Filing State Court Record by Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut re #6 Removal Order. (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1 in globo Certified Copy of State Court Suit Record, #2 Supplemental Matrix)(aty,Calvit, H) Modified docket text on 8/22/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Consent filed by Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut regarding #14 Notice of Deficiency,, #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,, #8 Jurisdictional Review Finding,, . (aty,Calvit, H)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency to H Bradford Calvit on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut regarding #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,, #8 Jurisdictional Review Finding. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,, #8 Jurisdictional Review Finding by Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental and/or Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Calvit, H) Modified to reflect deficient status on 8/19/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/19/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #15 for Certificate of Consent.
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE Memorandum on Jurisdiction re #8 Jurisdictional Review Finding by Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exh 1 Corp Docs)(aty,Calvit, H) Modified docket text on 8/16/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co identifying Corporate Parent B G C Management Inc and Corporate Parent Brookshire Holdings Inc for Brookshires Grocery Co. (aty,Calvit, H) Modified to add corporate parent names on 8/5/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut for Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut, identifying Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Co, identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp, identify Corporate Parent Travelers Companies Inc . (aty,Calvit, H) Modified corporate parents on 8/5/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by G M C Produce L L C. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(aty,Potter, Russell) Modified on 8/1/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. ORDERED that,no later than 21 days from service of this Order, Defendants Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut and Brookshire Grocery Co. shall file: (1) a Jurisdictional Memorandum stating whether Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut is incorporated. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff will be allowed 7 days from receipt of Defendants jurisdictional memorandum to file a response Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/24/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut.(aty,Calvit, H)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/23/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 9/17/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by G M C Produce L L C (Attorney Russell L Potter added to party G M C Produce L L C(pty:dft)). (aty,Potter, Russell)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to H Bradford Calvit, Eli Jules Meaux on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/5/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 22, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Brookshire Grocery Co, Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut answer due 7/26/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 265,331 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4002737) filed by Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut, Brookshire Grocery Company. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Certificate of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Matrix, #5 Exh 1 Certified Suit Record)(Attorney H Bradford Calvit added to party Brookshire Grocery Company(pty:dft), Attorney H Bradford Calvit added to party Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut(pty:dft))(aty,Calvit, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sexton v. Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Represented By: Eli Jules Meaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Company
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G M C Produce L L C
Represented By: Andrew P Texada
Represented By: Russell L Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Co
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Represented By: Eli Jules Meaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Sexton
Represented By: David Todd Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?