Aguilar Pineda v. Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Olvin Alberto Aguilar Pineda
Defendant: David Rivera, Devin McAleenan, Dept of Homeland Security and David Cole
Case Number: 1:2019cv00981
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO STRIKE for failure to: Submit document on approved form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/9/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Olvin Alberto Aguilar Pineda, LaSalle Detention Facility, re: #3 Sec P - Deficiency Order returned marked: RTS. No longer here. (crt,Haik, K)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Olvin Alberto Aguilar Pineda, LaSalle Detention Facility, re: 4 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: Return to Sender. (crt,Haik, K)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/1/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 2241 form)(crt,Haik, K)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 14635002901, filing fee $5) filed by Olvin Alberto Aguilar Pineda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F - G, #4 Civil cover sheet, #5 Envelope)(crt,Roaix, G) . Complaint not on approved forms.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar Pineda v. Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olvin Alberto Aguilar Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?