Lambert et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London et al
Plaintiff: Clara Lambert and Shannon Lambert
Defendant: Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc., Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo, Vazques & Carrier and Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01080
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 2 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 PLAN OF WORK filed by All Parties. Discovery deadline 10/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2020. Final Date for Expert Employment 7/1/2020. Exchange of Expert Reports due by 9/1/2020. Expert Depositions due by 10/5/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/4/2019. See Order for remainder of deadlines. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 9 Proposed Plan of Work. Pretrial Conference is set for 2/18/2021 at 1:45 PM, in chambers, before Judge Dee D Drell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/1/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/1/2019 granting #11 Motion for Extension. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT ORAL MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Plan of Work deadlines. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 10/1/2019 at 3:00 PM,by phone, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Each party is to call our AT&T conference number at 877-336-1829. When you are prompted for an access code, enter 2670431. You will be placed on hold and will not hear anything except silence. However, the Clerk will join the call shortly thereafter. Only counsel of record may participate in the conference. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/10/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Shannon Lambert, Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc, Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed in error as Rule 26(f) Report. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 9/5/2019 to add document number. (Crick, S).
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Plan of Work by Shannon Lambert, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc, Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo . (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Easley, Jeff) Modified on 9/5/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc. (aty,Jeansonne, Jordan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc, Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo.(aty,Jeansonne, Jordan) Modified on 8/21/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/20/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 10/15/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/19/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Guy D Perrier, Jordan Michael Jeansonne on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/3/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo, Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #14 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC - Rapides Parish, Case Number 264981 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4026693) filed by Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc., Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 List of Parties, #9 List of Pleadings, #10 Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit 7)(Attorney Jordan Michael Jeansonne added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Michael Jeansonne added to party Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Michael Jeansonne added to party Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Jeansonne, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Vazquez-Castillo
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vazques & Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vazquez & Co Carriers Inc
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lambert
Represented By: Stephen Joshua Spurgeon
Represented By: Samuel James Spurgeon
Represented By: Jeff David Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?