Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc v. 3-V Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Defendant: 3-V Partnership, Steven D Vinson, Donna Smith Vinson and Steven Blake Vinson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01103
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. Steven Blake Vinson waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. Steven D Vinson waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. Donna Smith Vinson served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. 3-V Partnership served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/5/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank Company for Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 10/21/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Mark James Chaney, III on behalf of Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/5/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3-V Partnership, Donna Smith Vinson, Steven D Vinson, Steven Blake Vinson (crt,Williams, L)
August 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Williams, L)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3-V Partnership, Donna Smith Vinson, Steven D. Vinson, Steven Blake Vinson (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4031015) filed by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed summons/writ, #8 Proposed summons/writ, #9 Proposed summons/writ, #10 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Mark James Chaney, III added to party Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Chaney, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc v. 3-V Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3-V Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Smith Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Blake Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Represented By: Richard A Aguilar
Represented By: Mark James Chaney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?