Moran et al v. American Honda Motor Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: Chasity Tassin and Andrew Moran
Defendant: Petersen Automotive Interests L L C, American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda Motor Co Ltd and Honda R & D Co Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv01203
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Affidavit)(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Andrew Moran, Chasity Tassin. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Affidavit of Andrew Moran, #2 Exhibit A -Recall Notice/Flier, #3 Exhibit B-VIN Inquiry Report)(aty,Ritch, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Petersen Automotive Interests L L C answer due 9/20/2019. See pdf document, Attachment #1 to #9 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda Motor Co Ltd, Honda R & D Co Ltd and Petersen Automotive Interests L L C in 12th JDC Avoyelles Parish, Case Number 2019-7067. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #1 to #9 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by American Honda Motor Co Inc . (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
September 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Honda Motor Co Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture jury demand requested within #7 Answer to Complaint. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 9/24/2019 to correct filed date (Dauterive, C).
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Honda Motor Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co Ltd for American Honda Motor Co Inc. (aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Honda Motor Co Inc.(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre) Modified on 9/24/2019 to reflect jury demand (Dauterive, C).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/16/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/16/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 11/12/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Deirdre C McGlinchey on behalf of American Honda Motor Co Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 13, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 12th JDC Avoyelles Parish, Case Number 2019-7067 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4048855) filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Deirdre C McGlinchey added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran et al v. American Honda Motor Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petersen Automotive Interests L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: Deirdre C McGlinchey
Represented By: Colvin G Norwood, Jr
Represented By: Patrick J O'Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R & D Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity Tassin
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Edmond Humphries Knoll
Represented By: Samuel Charles Ward
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Moran
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Edmond Humphries Knoll
Represented By: Samuel Charles Ward
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?