Scirocco et al v. F C A U S L L C et al
Plaintiff: Marcus John Scirocco and Summer Scirocco
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Vidalia Center LLC, Natchez Hardware Center Inc, Vidalia Center L L C, Home Hardware Center, Supermarket Operations Inc, F C A U S L L C and Central Network Retail Group L L C
Case Number: 1:2019cv01543
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Supermarket Operations Inc (Attorney Bonita K Preuett-Armour added to party Supermarket Operations Inc(pty:dft) (aty,Preuett-Armour, Bonita) Modified on 1/23/2020 to removed Vidalia Center L L C as filer (Reeves, T).
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vidalia Center L L C. (aty,Sanders, Mike)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: 11 Answer sent to Mike C Sanders, W David Hammett on behalf of Vidalia Center L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/17/2020. (crt,Whidden, C)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Second Supplemental and Amending Petition with Jury Demand by Central Network Retail Group L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN THE ATTACHMENTS OF DOCUMENT #10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER)(Attorney Chelsey T Colontonio added to party Central Network Retail Group L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Whidden, C)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Petition, First Supplemental and Amending Petition, and Second Supplemental and Amending Petition by Vidalia Center L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (The PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN THE ATTACHMENTS OF DOCUMENT #10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER)(Attorney Mike C Sanders added to party Vidalia Center L L C(pty:dft), Attorney W David Hammett added to party Vidalia Center L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Whidden, C)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by F C A U S L L C List of Parties and Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Volume 1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Volume 2 State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Volume 3 State Court Record)(aty,McDaniel, Keith)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Network Retail Group L L C, Home Hardware Center (Attorney Stephan Michael Cooper added to party Home Hardware Center(pty:dft)). (aty,Cooper, Stephan) Modified on 12/23/2019 to add Corporate Parent Tyndale Advisors L L C (Dauterive, C).
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F C A U S L L C identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N V, Corporate Parent F C A North America Holdings LLC for F C A U S L L C. (aty,McDaniel, Keith)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Consent to Removal sent to Stephan Michael Cooper on behalf of Central Network Retail Group L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/26/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 1/31/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Central Network Retail Group L L C (Attorney Stephan Michael Cooper added to party Natchez Hardware Center Inc(pty:dft)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Cooper, Stephan) Modified on 12/12/2019 to add correct party (Dauterive, C).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/6/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Quincy T Crochet, Mary Wilderotter Dale, Keith W McDaniel on behalf of F C A U S L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 2, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, First Supplemental & Amending Complaint, Second Supplemental Amending Complaint, with Jury Demand by F C A U S L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
December 2, 2019 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDing COMPLAINT against F C A U S L L C, Natchez Hardware Center Inc, Vidalia Center L L C filed by Summer Scirocco, Marcus John Scirocco. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
December 2, 2019 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDing COMPLAINT against F C A U S L L C, Natchez Hardware Center Inc, Vidalia Center L L C filed by Summer Scirocco, Marcus John Scirocco. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 7th JDC Concordia Parish, Case Number 52159 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4122099) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages, #4 Exhibit C - Second Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit D - FCA's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages, #6 Exhibit E - Central Network Retail Group, LLC d/b/a Home Hardware Center's Answer to Second Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages, #7 Exhibit F - FCA's Requests for Admission, Requests for Production, and Interrogatories to Vidalia Center, LLC, #8 Exhibit G - Vidalis Center, LLC's Responses to FCA's Requests for Admission, #9 Exhibit H - State Court Pleadings, #10 Exhibit I - Summer Scirocco's Air Evac Records)(Attorney Keith W McDaniel added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(aty,McDaniel, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scirocco et al v. F C A U S L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Keith W McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vidalia Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natchez Hardware Center Inc
Represented By: Stephan Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vidalia Center L L C
Represented By: Mike C Sanders
Represented By: W David Hammett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Hardware Center
Represented By: Stephan Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supermarket Operations Inc
Represented By: Bonita K Preuett-Armour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F C A U S L L C
Represented By: Quincy T Crochet
Represented By: Mary Wilderotter Dale
Represented By: Keith W McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Network Retail Group L L C
Represented By: Stephan Michael Cooper
Represented By: Chelsey T Colontonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus John Scirocco
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Scirocco
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?