Pal v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Karan Pal
Defendant: Matthew T Albence, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Reeves, T)
January 3, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Reeves, T)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-02092. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Louisiana at Alexandria by electronic case transfer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to all counsel of record and to alert the Western District of Louisiana about the pending motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of William Frick re #4 Minute Order, by Petitioner Karan Pal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Online Detainee Locator Information)(Frick, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 Supplemental BRIEF re #4 Minute Order, by Petitioner Karan Pal (Frick, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 1/14/2020. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]
December 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly DEFERRING ruling on petitioner's motion for temporary restraining order, docket no. #2 , pending the filing of a supplemental brief and supporting declaration. See Minute Order for further details. (KK) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman and Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Karan Pal. (SG) Modified on 12/27/2019 Motion documents regenerated to AUSA(SG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-6065964), filed by Karan Pal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Supplement Motion For Emergeny TRO (see dkt #2 ), # (3) Proposed Order) (see dkt #2 )(Frick, William) Modified on 12/27/2019 documents regenerated to AUSA (SG). Modified on 12/31/2019 (proposed order attached at #2 )(KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pal v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karan Pal
Represented By: William Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?