Lavergne et al v. Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Laura Lavergne and Anthony Lavergne
Defendant: Cassie Saucier, Steven Cloessner, William E Hilton, Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co, William Hicks, Billy Fuller, Cody King, Michael Belgard and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2020cv00265
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Anada, Tarak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. William Hicks waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (aty,Anada, Tarak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. William E Hilton waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (aty,Anada, Tarak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. Steven Cloessner waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (aty,Anada, Tarak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. Michael Belgard waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (aty,Anada, Tarak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. Cody King waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (aty,Anada, Tarak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. Cassie Saucier waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (aty,Anada, Tarak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. Billy Fuller waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (aty,Anada, Tarak)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 4/28/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/2/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Belgard, Steven Cloessner, Billy Fuller, William Hicks, William E Hilton, Cody King, Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co, Cassie Saucier. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 28, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Belgard, Steven Cloessner, Billy Fuller, William Hicks, William E Hilton, Cody King, Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co, Cassie Saucier with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4195330) filed by Anthony Lavergne, Laura Lavergne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Alyson Vamvoras Antoon added to party Anthony Lavergne(pty:pla), Attorney Alyson Vamvoras Antoon added to party Laura Lavergne(pty:pla))(aty,Antoon, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavergne et al v. Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lavergne
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Alyson Vamvoras Antoon
Represented By: Alexander N Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Michael Noel Antoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lavergne
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Alyson Vamvoras Antoon
Represented By: Alexander N Breckinridge, V
Represented By: Michael Noel Antoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassie Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Cloessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Belgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?