Laborde v. American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees International et al
Plaintiff: Ina Laborde
Defendant: Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17, AFSCME, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O and American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees
Case Number: 1:2020cv00318
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 27 Joint PROPOSED Plan of Work by American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend, Ina Laborde . Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie) Modified on 5/8/2020 to add filer (MiletelloSld, A).
May 7, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend filed by Ina Laborde.(crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend original complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/7/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct original complaint with consent by Ina Laborde. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 5/6/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO STRIKE #19 MOTION to Amend original complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/4/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER re #19 Motion to Amend/Correct, Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/1/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
April 8, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie)
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency to William Alan Pesnell on behalf of Ina Laborde regarding #19 MOTION to Amend original complaint. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 STRICKEN DEFICIENT? MOTION to Amend original complaint in #1 Notice of Removal with consent sought but not yet obtained by Ina Laborde. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 4/7/2020 to indicate as deficient and modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A). Modified on 5/4/2020 to indicate stricken, see #23 Order (MiletelloSld, A).
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend. (aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie) Modified on 4/6/2020 to correct docket entry relationship and modify docket text(MiletelloSld, A).
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 4/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/1/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 1, 2020 Filing 16 EXHIBIT styled as Declaration of Ina Laborde re #15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Ina Laborde. (aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 4/1/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Ina Laborde. (Attachments: #1 Proposed exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit AA, #3 Exhibit BB, #4 Exhibit CC, #5 Exhibit DD, #6 Exhibit EE, #7 Exhibit FF, #8 Exhibit GG)(aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 4/1/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of consent re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Ina Laborde (aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 3/31/2020 to more accurately describe document and modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent sought but not yet obtained by Ina Laborde. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pesnell, William) Modified on 3/31/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mark J Murphy for American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/20/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Aaron S Edelman for American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/20/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Mark J. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4215060) by American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Filed in error-Proposed order - see pdf of main document for proposed order)(aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie) Modified on 3/20/2020 to reflect proposed order included within pdf of main document (MiletelloSld, A).
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Aaron S. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4215015) by American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/16/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 5/9/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend re #2 Motion to Dismiss,. (aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition by American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend. (aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie)
March 10, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 10, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees, Dorothy Townsend answer due 3/17/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17, Lloyd Permaul, Dorothy Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie) Modified on 3/11/2020 to indicate Exhibit A-1 filed as document #3 , to correct motion event and add MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim (Dauterive, C).
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 267,287 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4205825) filed by Dorothy Townsend, Louisiana Public Employees Council 17, AFSCME, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Lloyd Permaul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A with attachments, #2 Exhibit B Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Julie M Richard-Spencer added to party American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees(pty:dft), Attorney Julie M Richard-Spencer added to party Louisiana Public Employees Council 17, AFSCME(pty:dft), Attorney Julie M Richard-Spencer added to party Lloyd Permaul(pty:dft), Attorney Julie M Richard-Spencer added to party Dorothy Townsend(pty:dft))(aty,Richard-Spencer, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborde v. American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Permaul
Represented By: Julie M Richard-Spencer
Represented By: Mark J Murphy
Represented By: Aaron S Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Townsend
Represented By: Julie M Richard-Spencer
Represented By: Mark J Murphy
Represented By: Aaron S Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Represented By: Julie M Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Public Employees Council 17, AFSCME
Represented By: Julie M Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Public Employees Council 17 A F S C M E A F L - C I O
Represented By: Julie M Richard-Spencer
Represented By: Mark J Murphy
Represented By: Aaron S Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State County & Municipal Employees
Represented By: Julie M Richard-Spencer
Represented By: Mark J Murphy
Represented By: Aaron S Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Laborde
Represented By: William Alan Pesnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?