Baxley Jr v. Paccar Inc
Plaintiff: Ira Baxley, Jr
Defendant: Paccar Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00383
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Ira Baxley, Jr, Paccar Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pharis, Fred) Modified on 5/22/2020 to add filer (Williams, L).
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paccar Inc. (aty,Zimmer, Scott) Modified on 4/22/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to Scott L Zimmer on behalf of Paccar Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/5/2020. (crt,Williams, L)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Paccar Inc.(Attorney Scott L Zimmer added to party Paccar Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Zimmer, Scott)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/26/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 5/24/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paccar Inc (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 25, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paccar Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4220033) filed by Ira Baxley Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Fred A Pharis added to party Ira Baxley Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Pharis, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxley Jr v. Paccar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc
Represented By: Scott L Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Baxley, Jr
Represented By: Fred A Pharis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?