Coleman v. Lowes Home Centers L L C et al
Plaintiff: Russell Coleman
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Charles Jones, Lowes Home Center Inc, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental Inc, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA and Lowes Home Centers L L C
Case Number: 1:2020cv00804
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Russell Coleman. (aty,Ledet, Eugene)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Lowes Home Centers L L C, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, Ryder Truck Rental Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service)(aty,Rispone, Lacey)
July 24, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowes Home Centers L L C, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, Ryder Truck Rental Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHED TO RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER #10 ATTACHMENT #1.(crt,Jones, P)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Lowes Home Centers L L C, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, Ryder Truck Rental Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Index of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Counsel)(aty,Rispone, Lacey)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Jones, P)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Russell Coleman. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Ledet, Eugene) Modified on 7/16/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Home Centers L L C, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, Ryder Truck Rental Inc indicating other affiliates Lowes Companies Inc, for Lowes Home Centers L L C; A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, AI G Property Casualty Inc, American International Group Inc for National Union Fire Insurance Co; Ryder Systems Inc for Ryder Truck Rental Inc.. (aty,Rispone, Lacey) Modified on 7/7/2020 to add filer and other affiliates (Jones, P).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 6/26/2020. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/26/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 8/23/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/25/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Paul J Politz, David Scott Rainwater, Lacey Sanchez Rispone on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/9/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 24, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 24, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC answer due 7/1/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Rapides, Case Number 267,821 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4303198) filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Corr from Plf's counsel's office 9/17/20 - 6/22/20, #3 Exhibit C - Orthopaedic Reconstructive Subspecialist 7/19/19, #4 Exhibit D - Orthopaedic Reconstructive Subspecialist 3/27/20, #5 Exhibit E - Orthopaedic Reconstructive Subspecialist 5/8/20, #6 Exhibit F - MRI Report, #7 Exhibit G - Plf's Answer to Interrogatory No. 8 & 9, #8 Exhibit H - Plf's Alleged Special Damages, #9 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Lacey Sanchez Rispone added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lacey Sanchez Rispone added to party National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA(pty:dft), Attorney Lacey Sanchez Rispone added to party Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Rispone, Lacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Lowes Home Centers L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: Lacey Sanchez Rispone
Represented By: Paul J Politz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: Lacey Sanchez Rispone
Represented By: Paul J Politz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: Lacey Sanchez Rispone
Represented By: Paul J Politz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental Inc
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: Lacey Sanchez Rispone
Represented By: Paul J Politz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: Lacey Sanchez Rispone
Represented By: Paul J Politz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers L L C
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: Lacey Sanchez Rispone
Represented By: Paul J Politz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Coleman
Represented By: Laura B Knoll
Represented By: Ethan Edwin Caubarreaux
Represented By: Eugene A Ledet, Jr
Represented By: Brock Hadyn Duke
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?