Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cleveland L Harris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00910
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Crick, S)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Cleveland L Harris. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Wicklund, Edward)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Edward A Wicklund for Cleveland L Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/16/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Crick, S)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/23/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/23/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward A Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4328848) by Cleveland L. Harris. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified on 7/22/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cleveland L. Harris. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Cleveland L. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Cleveland L. Harris(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland L Harris
Represented By: Benjamin M Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?