Davis v. McConnell
Plaintiff: Montavius P Davis
Defendant: C McConnell
Case Number: 1:2020cv01070
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/21/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/21/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 In forma pauperis form)(crt,Taylor, L)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/19/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Montavius P Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montavius P Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?