Hardwick v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Margie Lola Hardwick
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00009
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Transcript due 4/21/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Margie Lola Hardwick. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/21/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Wicklund, Edward)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Edward A Wicklund for Margie Lola Hardwick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/11/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Jones, P)
January 5, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Jones, P)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4522603) by Margie Lola Hardwick. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4522583) filed by Margie Lola Hardwick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Margie Lola Hardwick(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/6/2021 in correct pdf format) (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardwick v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Lola Hardwick
Represented By: Benjamin M Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?