Barnes et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Plaintiff: Chad Vanhuis, All Plaintiffs, Brandon Long, Wesley Hilborn, Katie Cook, Barth Properties, LLC, Sandra Crawford, Sandra London Waller, Stacy Tucker, Monica Campbell, Danelle Bardwell, Tammy George, Erlina De Asis, Teresa Webb, Patsy Adams, Connie Methvin, Joshua Dara, Patricia Grimes, Kristine Hilborn, Dinton Kitchens, Jr., Marietta Stewart, Lisa Greer, Danny Campbell, Julie Aguillard, Jennifer Foster Tarver, Campbell's Construction, Inc, Grimes Family Properties, LLC, Barth & Grimes Properties, LLC, Danny Creel, Veronica Kitchens, Pete Cerami, Jr., Christopher Cook, Debra Gilley, Michale T Guillory, Mary N Gauthier, Sharon Hodges, Amber C. Delgadillo, Tommie Mack Granger, Dustin Eller, Jacob Barnes, Gary Barth, Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate, LLC, Darla W Corley, Majorie Cook, Mary A Lemoine, Christopher Beeson, Kenneth L Tracy, Patrick Bardwell, Gerald C Carmouche, Hollie Colvin, Vicky Marcantel, Amy Barnes, Louise Wilkerson, Harold Fountain, Ashley Rodgers, Tabitha Benedict, Jack Cooper, Sr., Jamie Henagan, Angela Lacroix, Theresa H Chesser, Sarah J McCoy, Denise White, Jaimee A Gauthier, Carol Eddlemon, Fuel Plus Chevron, Inc., Andrea Henagan, Margaret O'Neal, Esteven Delgadillo, Ileen Thompson, Dare Granger, Nettie M Colwell, Thomas Campbell, Kathalene Barth, Leslie Morgan, Hilborn Enterprises, LLC, Ann Marie Ermatinger, Frank Grimes, Judy Aguillard, Ana Methvin Butler, Mary Bardwell, Sandra Furhmann, Joanne Bentoncourt, Cynthia Woodward, Sarah White, Albert N Downs, Katherine Marino, Sherie Cooper, Marilyn W Peterson, Emily V Baum, Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate L L C, Barth Properties L L C, Ryan Chase Baum, Dinton Kitchens, Jr, Frank Grimes, Sr, Jack Cooper, Sr, Barth & Grimes Properties L L C, Hilborn Enterprises L L C, Fuel Plus Chevron Inc, Pam Chandler, Jaimee Ann Gauthier, Campbells Construction Inc, Pete Cerami, Jr, Grimes Family Properties L L C, Chaz Cannova, Margaret W Grimes, Veronica M Kitchens, Sandra M Furhmann, Amber C Delgadillo and Mark Chandler
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc, Dresser L L C, Dresser RE, LLC, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Co, Dresser R E L L C, Dresser Inc and Dresser Industries Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00024
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Campbells Construction Inc, Barth & Grimes Properties L L C, Barth Properties L L C, Hilborn Enterprises L L C, Grimes Family Properties L L C, Fuel Plus Chevron, Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate L L C. (aty,Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 1/19/2021 to correct filers (Jones, P).
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/11/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PROPOSED CLASS ACTION against Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, Halliburton Energy Services Inc with Jury Demand filed by Chaz Cannova, Emily V. Baum, Margaret W Grimes, Frank Grimes, Sr, Ryan Chase Baum, Mark Chandler, Pam Chandler, All Plaintiffs.(Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Chaz Cannova, Emily V. Baum, Ryan Chase Baum, Mark Chandler, Pam Chandler, Frank Grimes, Sr, Margaret W Grimes(pty:pla))(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (crt,Jones, P)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr, Barbara Bell Melton, Mary Katherine Price, Richard Frederick Norem, III on behalf of Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate L L C, Barth & Grimes Properties L L C, Barth Properties L L C, Campbell's Construction Inc, Fuel Plus Chevron Inc, Grimes Family Properties L L C, Hilborn Enterprises L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/21/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
January 6, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Jones, P)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser RE, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4524396) filed by Katherine Marino, Joshua Dara, Ann Marie Ermatinger, Sandra Crawford, Christopher Cohea, Evangeline Cook, Campbell's Construction, Inc, Christopher Beeson, Cynthia Woodward, Leslie Morgan, Sandra Furhmann, Grimes Family Properties, LLC, Daisy Cook, Frank Grimes, Haley Guillory, Braden Greer, Vicky Marcantel, Christopher Cook, Tabitha Benedict, Darla W Corley, Veronika Cooper, Denise White, Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate, LLC, Stacy Tucker, Amber C. Delgadillo, Albert N Downs, Kathalene Barth, Chad Vanhuis, Dare Granger, Barth Properties, LLC, Sarah J McCoy, Erlina De Asis, Mary A Lemoine, Veronica Kitchens, Theresa H Chesser, Sandra London Waller, Harold Fountain, Dinton Kitchens, Jr, Andrea Henagan, Judy Aguillard, Teresa Webb, Mary N Gauthier, Haley Cohea, Ashley Rodgers, Connie Methvin, Wesley Hilborn, Jaimee A Gauthier, Barth & Grimes Properties, LLC, Ileen Thompson, Lisa Greer, Breana Butler, Sherie Cooper, Brandon Long, Blaze Henagan, Lola Fontenot, Danny Creel, Jamie Henagan, Fuel Plus Chevron, Inc., Braylee Carmouche, Makayla Methvin, Gavin Greer, Aspen Henagan, Emily Cook, Rush Henagan, Patricia Grimes, Amy Barnes, Jacob Barnes, Majorie Cook, Julie Aguillard, Carol Eddlemon, Patsy Adams, Tammy George, Marietta Stewart, Angela Lacroix, Danelle Bardwell, Nettie M Colwell, Hilborn Enterprises, LLC, Ana Methvin Butler, Katie Cook, Dustin Eller, Sarah White, Esteven Delgadillo, Landon Greer, Sharon Hodges, Anthony W. Crawford, Debra Gilley, Joanne Bentoncourt, Kristine Hilborn, Hollie Colvin, Kenneth L Tracy, Margaret O'Neal, Monica Campbell, Gerald C Carmouche, Patrick Bardwell, Nicole Barnes, Louise Wilkerson, Gary Barth, Jack Cooper, Sr, Marilyn W Peterson, Pete Cerami, Jr, Thomas Campbell, Jennifer Foster Tarver, Joey Barnes, Tommie Mack Granger, Mary Bardwell, Michale T Guillory, Danny Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Patsy Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Judy Aguillard(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Julie Aguillard(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Danelle Bardwell(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Mary Bardwell(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Patrick Bardwell(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Amy Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Jacob Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Joey Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Nicole Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Gary Barth(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Kathalene Barth(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Barth & Grimes Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Barth Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Christopher Beeson(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Tabitha Benedict(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Joanne Bentoncourt(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Ana Methvin Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Breana Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Danny Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Monica Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Thomas Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Campbell's Construction, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Braylee Carmouche(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Gerald C Carmouche(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Pete Cerami, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Theresa H Chesser(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Christopher Cohea(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Haley Cohea(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Hollie Colvin(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Nettie M Colwell(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Christopher Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Daisy Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Emily Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Evangeline Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Katie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Majorie Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Jack Cooper, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Sherie Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Veronika Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Darla W Corley(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Anthony W. Crawford(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Sandra Crawford(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Danny Creel(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Joshua Dara(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Erlina De Asis(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Amber C. Delgadillo(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Esteven Delgadillo(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Albert N Downs(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Carol Eddlemon(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Dustin Eller(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Ann Marie Ermatinger(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Lola Fontenot(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Harold Fountain(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Fuel Plus Chevron, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Sandra Furhmann(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Jaimee A Gauthier(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Mary N Gauthier(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Tammy George(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Debra Gilley(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Dare Granger(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Tommie Mack Granger(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Braden Greer(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Gavin Greer(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Landon Greer(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Lisa Greer(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Frank Grimes(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Patricia Grimes(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Grimes Family Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Haley Guillory(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Michale T Guillory(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Andrea Henagan(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Aspen Henagan(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Blaze Henagan(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Jamie Henagan(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Rush Henagan(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Kristine Hilborn(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Wesley Hilborn(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Hilborn Enterprises, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Sharon Hodges(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Dinton Kitchens, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Veronica Kitchens(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Angela Lacroix(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Mary A Lemoine(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Brandon Long(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Vicky Marcantel(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Katherine Marino(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Sarah J McCoy(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Connie Methvin(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Makayla Methvin(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Leslie Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Margaret O'Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Marilyn W Peterson(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Ashley Rodgers(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Marietta Stewart(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Jennifer Foster Tarver(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Ileen Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Kenneth L Tracy(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Stacy Tucker(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Chad Vanhuis(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Sandra London Waller(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Teresa Webb(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Denise White(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Sarah White(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Louise Wilkerson(pty:pla), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Cynthia Woodward(pty:pla))(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Vanhuis
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Long
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Hilborn
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Cook
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barth Properties, LLC
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Crawford
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra London Waller
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Tucker
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Campbell
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danelle Bardwell
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy George
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlina De Asis
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Webb
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Adams
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Methvin
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Dara
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Grimes
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Hilborn
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinton Kitchens, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marietta Stewart
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Greer
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Campbell
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Aguillard
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Foster Tarver
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campbell's Construction, Inc
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grimes Family Properties, LLC
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barth & Grimes Properties, LLC
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Creel
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Kitchens
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Cerami, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cook
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Gilley
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michale T Guillory
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary N Gauthier
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hodges
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber C. Delgadillo
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Mack Granger
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Eller
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Barnes
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Barth
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla W Corley
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majorie Cook
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A Lemoine
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Beeson
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Tracy
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bardwell
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald C Carmouche
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollie Colvin
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Marcantel
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Barnes
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Wilkerson
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Fountain
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Rodgers
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Benedict
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Cooper, Sr.
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Henagan
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lacroix
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa H Chesser
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah J McCoy
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise White
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaimee A Gauthier
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Eddlemon
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuel Plus Chevron, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Henagan
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret O'Neal
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteven Delgadillo
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ileen Thompson
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dare Granger
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nettie M Colwell
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Campbell
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathalene Barth
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Morgan
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilborn Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Ermatinger
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Grimes
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Aguillard
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Methvin Butler
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bardwell
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Furhmann
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Bentoncourt
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Woodward
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah White
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert N Downs
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Marino
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherie Cooper
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn W Peterson
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily V Baum
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria/Pineville Real Estate L L C
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barth Properties L L C
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Chase Baum
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinton Kitchens, Jr
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Grimes, Sr
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Cooper, Sr
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barth & Grimes Properties L L C
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilborn Enterprises L L C
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuel Plus Chevron Inc
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Chandler
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaimee Ann Gauthier
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campbells Construction Inc
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Cerami, Jr
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grimes Family Properties L L C
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaz Cannova
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret W Grimes
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica M Kitchens
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M Furhmann
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber C Delgadillo
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Chandler
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser RE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser R E L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?