LeBlanc et al v. Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C et al
Plaintiff: Gregory LeBlanc and Teresa LeBlanc
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, LA Dept of Environmental Quality, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C and Baker Hughes Holdings L L C
Case Number: 1:2021cv00142
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mitchell Blake Bryant for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tracie Jo Renfroe for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Craig Andrew Stanfield for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608761) by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608729) by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Tracie Jo Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608725) by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY: A STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 03/24/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via video teleconference before Mag. Judge Perez-Montes. All attendance at this hearing will be by video conference. An email with the access link will be sent the day prior to the hearing. All counsel of record are responsible for sharing access information with represented parties, witnesses, or other persons associated with parties or witnesses that wish to attend. Participants are reminded of requirements of our local rules with respect to proper attire in the courtroom. They are to abide by those requirements even when participating via teleconference. Compliance Deadline set for 3/22/2021.The public is welcome to participate via video conference and may send an email request to JPM_VTC@lawd.uscourts.gov to request access information. The access will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Those who are granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanction deemed necessary by the Court. The public is also reminded that silence must be observed by all audience members and any public outbursts will be met with immediate removal of video and audio feed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/12/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory LeBlanc, Teresa LeBlanc. Dresser L L C waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (aty,Schwab, Donna)
March 2, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory LeBlanc, Teresa LeBlanc. Baker Hughes Holdings L L C waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (aty,Schwab, Donna)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory LeBlanc, Teresa LeBlanc. Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (aty,Schwab, Donna)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory LeBlanc, Teresa LeBlanc. (aty,Schwab, Donna)
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory LeBlanc, Teresa LeBlanc. (aty,Schwab, Donna)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory LeBlanc, Teresa LeBlanc. LA Dept of Environmental Quality served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (aty,Schwab, Donna)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, LA Dept of Environmental Quality. (crt,Taylor, L)
February 5, 2021 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C, LA Dept of Environmental Quality, requested by Gregory LeBlanc, Teresa LeBlanc. (aty,Schwab, Donna)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Dresser L L C identifying Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Holdings L L C for Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Dresser L L C; Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Holdings L L C for Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C; Corporate Parent GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc, Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Company, Corporate Parent EHHC NewCo LLC for Baker Hughes Holdings L L C. (aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 1/28/2021 to add Corporate Parent General Electric Co for Baker Hughes Holdings L L C (Dauterive, C).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/22/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/21/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew M Stakelum on behalf of Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/3/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/20/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 19, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Parish of Rapides, Case Number 269,710E with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4540899) filed by Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C and Dresser L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party BAKER HUGHES ENERGY SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party BAKER HUGHES, A GE COMPANY, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party DRESSER, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 1/20/2021 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBlanc et al v. Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Environmental Quality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser L L C
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Holdings L L C
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Donna G Schwab
Represented By: Kyle B Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa LeBlanc
Represented By: Donna G Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?