Alexander et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Plaintiff: Elray DuBois, Elizabeth Alexander, Fred Alexander, Robert Foy, Chalong Breimal, Julia Glenn and Iris Starks
Defendant: Baker Hughes, A GE Company, LLC, GE Oil and Gas, Inc., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Baker Hughes, Inc., General Electric Company, Derek Descant, EHHC NewCo, LLC, Dresser RE LLC, Baker Hughes Holdings LLC, Dresser, LLC, Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, CFC Holdings, Inc., GE Oil and Gas LLC, GE Oil and Gas US Holdings I, Inc., Baker Hughes Company, G E Oil & Gas Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Halliburton Energy Services Inc, E H H C NewCo L L C, Dresser R E L L C, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, General Electric Co, C F C Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Co, G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, LA Dept of Environmental Quality, C F C Holdings Inc and Dresser L L C
Case Number: 1:2021cv00161
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mitchell Blake Bryant for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tracie Jo Renfroe for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Craig Andrew Stanfield for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
March 19, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #21 Motion to Dismiss, #22 Motion to Dismiss, #23 Motion to Dismiss & #24 Motion to Dismiss with consent. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Crick, S)
March 19, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #21 Motion to Dismiss, #22 Motion to Dismiss, #23 Motion to Dismiss & #24 Motion to Dismiss with consent by Elizabeth Alexander, Fred Alexander, Chalong Breimal, Elray DuBois, Robert Foy, Julia Glenn, Iris Starks. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Landry, Jason) Modified on 3/19/2021 to modify motion event, docket text and create docket entry relationships. (Crick, S).
March 16, 2021 Filing 32 Reply to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Elizabeth Alexander, Fred Alexander. (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 3/16/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 16, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608565) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Tracie Jo Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608555) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608530) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY: A STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 03/24/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via video teleconference before Mag. Judge Perez-Montes. All attendance at this hearing will be by video conference. An email with the access link will be sent the day prior to the hearing. All counsel of record are responsible for sharing access information with represented parties, witnesses, or other persons associated with parties or witnesses that wish to attend. Participants are reminded of requirements of our local rules with respect to proper attire in the courtroom. They are to abide by those requirements even when participating via teleconference. Compliance Deadline set for 3/22/2021. The public is welcome to participate via video conference and may send an email request to JPM_VTC@lawd.uscourts.gov to request access information. The access will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Those who are granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanction deemed necessary by the Court. The public is also reminded that silence must be observed by all audience members and any public outbursts will be met with immediate removal of video and audio feed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/12/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 11, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C, G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co, Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 3/11/2021 to modify filers. (Crick, S).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Tiffany Nicole Dupree for G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, Added as counsel Tiffany Nicole Dupree for General Electric Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/11/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 9, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Crick, S)
March 8, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(aty,Smith, Meghan)
March 8, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Derek Descant. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Derek Descant(pty:dft))(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 3/9/2021 (Crick, S).
March 8, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin). Added MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and modified docket text on 3/9/2021 (Crick, S).
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 Ex Parte MOTION for Tiffany Dupree to Enroll as Counsel by G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Smith, Meghan)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of J Scott Janoe for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/26/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 23, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for J. Scott Janoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4581090) by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin added to party Halliburton Energy Services Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) Modified on 2/23/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #16 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S)
February 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Elizabeth Alexander, Fred Alexander, Chalong Breimal, Elray DuBois, Robert Foy, Julia Glenn, Iris Starks. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Centola, Lawrence)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Halliburton Energy Services Inc identifying Corporate Parents, Halliburton Holdings L L C, Halliburton Co for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (aty,Layrisson, Louis) Modified on 2/8/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 3, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding State Court Service Returned Executed. Action taken: Modified answer due date for G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co to 3/8/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
February 3, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Baker Hughes Co answer due 2/4/2021; Baker Hughes Holdings L L C answer due 2/4/2021; Baker Hughes Inc answer due 2/4/2021; C F C Holdings L L C answer due 2/4/2021; Derek Descant answer due 1/27/2021; Dresser L L C answer due 2/4/2021; Dresser R E L L C answer due 2/4/2021; E H H C NewCo L L C answer due 2/4/2021; LA Dept of Environmental Quality answer due 2/9/2021; G E Oil & Gas Inc answer due 2/4/2021; G E Oil & Gas L L C answer due 2/4/2021; G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc answer due 3/8/2021; General Electric Co answer due 3/8/2021; Halliburton Energy Services Inc answer due 2/4/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to #13 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 2/4/2021 to indicate answer due date for G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co is 3/8/2021. See #10 Order. (Crick, S).
February 3, 2021 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by General Electric Co, Halliburton Energy Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to #13 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings Inc, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Modified the entry to reflect that the deadline for all defendants is extended until 3/8/21. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Co for G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc. (aty,Smith, Meghan)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Co. (aty,Smith, Meghan)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, All defendants answers are due on or before 3/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/1/2021. (crt,Roaix, G) Modified on 2/4/2021 to correct the entry for the deadline to reflect all defendants (Roaix, G).
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Smith, Meghan)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings Inc, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C, C F C Holdings L L C identifying Corporate Parents, G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, Baker Hughes Co, E H H C NewCo L L C, Dresser L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Baker Hughes Co, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co. (Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party G E Oil & Gas Inc(pty:dft), G E Oil & Gas L L C(pty:dft)). (aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 1/28/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/22/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Consent to Removal sent to Meghan Elizabeth Smith on behalf of G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/5/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/22/2021. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc (Attorney Meghan Elizabeth Smith added to party G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc(pty:dft)). (aty,Smith, Meghan)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/21/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew M Stakelum on behalf of Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings Inc, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/4/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 21, 2021 Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes added. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Parish of Rapides, Case Number 269,709A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4543358) filed by Baker Hughes, Inc., CFC Holdings, Inc., Baker Hughes Company, Dresser RE LLC, Baker Hughes, A GE Company, LLC, Dresser, LLC, EHHC NewCo, LLC, Baker Hughes Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes, A GE Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party CFC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser RE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party EHHC NewCo, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Stakelum, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. Dresser L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes, A GE Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Oil and Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Descant
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHHC NewCo, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser RE LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Holdings LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Oil and Gas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Oil and Gas US Holdings I, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Company
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E Oil & Gas Inc
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Inc
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E Oil & Gas L L C
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Holdings L L C
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: J Scott Janoe
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Represented By: Charles S Weems, III
Represented By: Stephen A LaFleur
Represented By: Louis E Layrisson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E H H C NewCo L L C
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser R E L L C
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Co
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Marjorie A McKeithen
Represented By: Tiffany Nicole Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C F C Holdings L L C
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Co
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc
Represented By: Marjorie A McKeithen
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Tiffany Nicole Dupree
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Environmental Quality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C F C Holdings Inc
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser L L C
Represented By: Michael J Cerniglia
Represented By: Mitchell Blake Bryant
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Robert J Burvant
Represented By: Eric E Jarrell
Represented By: Andrew M Stakelum
Represented By: Craig Andrew Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elray DuBois
Represented By: Thomas B Wahlder
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Stephen John Hecker
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Alexander
Represented By: Thomas B Wahlder
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Stephen John Hecker
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Alexander
Represented By: Thomas B Wahlder
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Stephen John Hecker
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Foy
Represented By: Thomas B Wahlder
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Stephen John Hecker
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chalong Breimal
Represented By: Thomas B Wahlder
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Stephen John Hecker
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Glenn
Represented By: Thomas B Wahlder
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Stephen John Hecker
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Starks
Represented By: Thomas B Wahlder
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Stephen John Hecker
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?