Abshire v. Public Safety & Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Clifford C Abshire, III
Defendant: LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, James Longino, John and/or Jane Doe, Marcus Myers, James LeBlanc, Jane Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00361
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to James LeBlanc, James Longino, Marcus Myers. Clerk sent copy of Summons, Notice to Parties, USM 285 forms, IFP Order and 1 Complaint to USM for service. (crt,Chicola, C)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #7 Motion to Enjoin Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/30/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Enjoin Preliminary Injunction by Clifford C Abshire, III. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Clifford C Abshire, III re #5 Memorandum Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for each defendant to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Clerk manually noticed order with forms. Pro Se Response due by 3/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Service Packet 1, #2 Service Packet 2, #3 Service Packet 3, #4 Service Packet 4)(crt,Chicola, C)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/12/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/11/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
February 10, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Clifford C Abshire, III. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Petition. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/10/2021. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to assign document number on 2/11/2021 (Devillier, W).
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clifford C Abshire, III. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2021: #2 Proposed order) (Devillier, W).
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John and/or Jane Doe, James LeBlanc, James Longino, Marcus Myers, LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections filed by Clifford C Abshire, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abshire v. Public Safety & Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Longino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford C Abshire, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?