Dukes v. Deville
Plaintiff: Ricardo K Dukes
Defendant: Keith Deville
Case Number: 1:2021cv00812
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ricardo K Dukes - Because Dukes's Petition (ECF No. 6) is second and successive and Dukes has not received authorization from the Fifth Circuit, IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Petition (ECF No. 1) be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction, WITH PREJUDICE as to the jurisdictional issue, and WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the merits of Dukess claims. Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 5/18/2021. (crt,Tice, Y) (a) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/18/2021 to reflect the correct ECF no. ) (Tice, Y).
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBITS re #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ricardo K Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Ricardo K Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ricardo K Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/29/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas 2254 Form)(crt,Reeves, T)
March 30, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Ricardo K Dukes in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635065483. (crt,Adams, K)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 EXHIBITS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ricardo K Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/29/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 25, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ricardo K Dukes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/25/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ricardo K Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/29/2021) (Devillier, W). Petition not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes v. Deville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo K Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Deville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?