Lemoine v. Moellenkamp et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Lemoine
Defendant: American Access Casualty Company, Linda Moellenkamp, FCCI Insurance Company, American Access Casualty Co and F C C I Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2021cv00983
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Linda Moellenkamp, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Whidden, C)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work Compliance Deadline set for 6/12/2021.) Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 4/16/2021. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/15/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to F C C I Insurance Co and Linda Moellenkamp. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Access Casualty Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 13, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 13, 2021 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, requested by Crystal Lemoine. (aty,Gremillion, Emily)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Access Casualty Co, F C C I Insurance Co and Linda Moellenkamp with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number BLAWDC-4638821) filed by Crystal Lemoine. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Emily Gremillion added to party Crystal Lemoine(pty:pla))(aty,Gremillion, Emily) Modified on 4/14/2021 to edit text (Dauterive, C). (Main Document 1 replaced with properly formatted pdf document on 4/14/2021). (Attachment 1 replaced with properly formatted pdf document on 4/14/2021) (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemoine v. Moellenkamp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Lemoine
Represented By: Emily Gremillion
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Eugene A Ledet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Access Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Moellenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCCI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Access Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F C C I Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?