Gutierrez v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Leonardo Gutierrez
Defendant: Chad F Wolf, Carlos Rodriguez, William Barr, Daniel Biblia, Warden Immigration Detention Facility and Luis Lopez
Case Number: 1:2021cv01689
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 48 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Leonardo Gutierrez, Winn Correctional Center, re: #46 Order on Motion to Dismiss, returned marked: RTS: Released. (crt,Haik, K)
July 26, 2021 Filing 47 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Leonardo Gutierrez, Winn Correctional Center, re: #45 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney, returned marked: RTS: Released. (crt,Haik, K)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED and the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/12/2021. (crt,Haik, K) (Main Document 46 replaced on 7/12/2021 to edit the pleading and reflect the correct division of signing) (Tice, Y).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jerry Edwards for William Barr,Jerry Edwards for Daniel Biblia,Jerry Edwards for Warden Immigration Detention Facility,Jerry Edwards for Luis Lopez,Jerry Edwards for Carlos Rodriguez,Jerry Edwards for Chad F Wolf. Attorney Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/9/2021. (crt,Haik, K)
July 8, 2021 Filing 44 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Leonardo Gutierrez, Winn Correctional Center, re: #38 Judgment re Report and Recommendations, #41 Transfer Order returned marked: Return to Sender; Released. (Attachments: #1 Return doc #41) (crt,Thomas, T)
July 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/7/2021. (crt,Haik, K)
July 7, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, Daniel Biblia, Warden Immigration Detention Facility, Luis Lopez, Carlos Rodriguez, Chad F Wolf. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Ladwig, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Edwards, Jerry)
July 6, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jerry Edwards in place of Eleanor A. Robinson-Gaither with consent by William Barr, Daniel Biblia, Warden Immigration Detention Facility, Luis Lopez, Carlos Rodriguez, Chad F Wolf. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Jerry Edwards added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry Edwards added to party Daniel Biblia(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry Edwards added to party Warden Immigration Detention Facility(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry Edwards added to party Luis Lopez(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry Edwards added to party Carlos Rodriguez(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry Edwards added to party Chad F Wolf(pty:dft))(aty,Edwards, Jerry)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/23/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 23, 2021 Filing 40 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
June 16, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
June 16, 2021 Filing 39 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00141. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: #34 Report and Recommendations. The District Court Clerk is ORDERED to transfer Petitioner's Petition to the U.S. District Court, Western District of Louisiana, Alexandria Division. (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to U.S. District Court, Western District of Louisiana - Alexandria Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 6/16/21, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 37 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 05/26/2021 re: 35 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 36 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Leonardo Gutierrez re: 35 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. It is recommended that the Court (1) GRANT Respondent's Amended Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and (2) TRANSFER Gutierrez's Petition to the U.S.D.C., Western District of Louisiana, Alexandria Division. Objections to R&R due by 6/2/2021(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(rnieto, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 32 Petitioner's Motion to Request Decision of Habeas Corpus, Motion to Expedite by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to #30 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, filed by Chad F. Wolf. (Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to #29 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #28 Letter, #23 MOTION to Expedite Court's Decision of Habeas Corpus, #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Leonardo Gutierrez. (jtabares, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 29 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #28 Letter, #23 MOTION to Expedite Court's Decision of Habeas Corpus, #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 28 Letter from Leonardo Gutierrez re: Status of Petition, filed. (dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 27 Petitioner's Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Leonardo Gutierrez. (JenniferLongoria, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 26 Petitioner's NOTICE to Change of Address by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed. (rnieto, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed. (dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to #23 MOTION to Expedite Court's Decision of Habeas Corpus, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #16 Response to Motion to Dismiss, filed by William Barr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Expedite Court's Decision of Habeas Corpus by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2021. (mperez, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (mperez, 1).[Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Daniel Biblia served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Chad F. Wolf served on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to William Barr served on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of Service Executed as to Carlos Rodriguez/ICE Deportation Officer on 9/25/2020 re: summons, filed.(mperez, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN of Service Executed as to Luis Lopez/ICE Deportation Officer on 9/25/2020 re: summons, filed.(mperez, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of Service Executed as to Warden of Immigration Detention Facility on 9/25/2020 re: summons, filed.(mperez, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 Rebuttal to RESPONDENT'S #14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Leonardo Gutierrez. (scastillo, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Leonardo Gutierrez re: status of petition, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit)(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 9/18/2020 re: 8 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of NON-CONSENT by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed.(scastillo, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 9/16/2020 re: 7 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of attorney substitution by Luis Lopez, Carlos Rodriguez, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, Chad F. Wolf. Attorney Eleanor Robinson Gaither added. Attorney Christopher D Pineda terminated, filed. (Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of attorney substitution by William Barr, Daniel Biblia. Attorney Eleanor Robinson Gaither added. Attorney Christopher D Pineda terminated, filed. (Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Duplicate entry of #5 ORDER granting Motion #2 . Responses due by 11/13/2020.The District Clerks Office is ORDERED to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order upon Respondents and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas, Ryan Patrick. Respondents are ORDERED to file a response to Gutierrezs Petition on or before November 13, 2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1) Modified on 9/14/2020 (dbenavides, 1). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The District Clerks Office is ORDERED to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order upon Respondents and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas, Ryan Patrick. Respondents are ORDERED to file a response to Gutierrezs Petition on or before November 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Daniel Biblia, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Luis Lopez,filed.(dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Carlos Rodriguez, filed.(dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, filed.(dbenavides, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant to 18 USC 3006A by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2020. (JenniferLongoria, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Leonardo Gutierrez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2020. (JenniferLongoria, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Leonardo Gutierrez.(JenniferLongoria, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Rodriguez
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Biblia
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Immigration Detention Facility
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Lopez
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?