Scarborough v. Sasser et al
Plaintiff: Desmond Deondre Scarborough
Defendant: Julie Sasser and Gerald Carmouche
Case Number: 1:2023cv01691
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Desmond Deondre Scarborough, Rapides Parish Detention Center I, P O Box 1551, Alexandria LA 71309-1551, re: #7 Memorandum Order returned marked: Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. (crt,Taylor, L)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST from Desmond Scarborough for violation of rights forms. Clerk mailed 1983 and IFP form on 12/12/2023. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Bowman, A)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Speak with Plaintiff's mother regarding cases by Desmond Deondre Scarborough. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T) Modified to edit docket entry text to more accurately describe pleading on 12/18/2023 (Haik, K).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to sign IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/8/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP application (Page 6))(crt,Williams, K)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 12/4/2023. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/4/2023. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite by Desmond Deondre Scarborough. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Kiper, C). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Kiper, C).
November 27, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Desmond Deondre Scarborough. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Breite, S) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W).
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Desmond Deondre Scarborough. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Breite, S) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #2 Proposed order). Need certification regarding prison account.
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Desmond Deondre Scarborough. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Breite, S) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #4 Exhibits) (Devillier, W). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/1/2023) (Devillier, W).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarborough v. Sasser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Deondre Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Carmouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?