Deal v. American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Sharieka Deal
Defendant: Paschall Truck Lines Inc, American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co Risk Retention Group, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Christopher Gaston, Leecindy Williams and American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2023cv01707
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 02/07/2024 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes. All attendance at this hearing will be by video conference. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. An email with the link access will be sent the day prior to the hearing. Participants are reminded of requirements of our local rules with respect to proper attire in the courtroom. They are to abide by those requirements even when participating via teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/25/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 17, 2024 Filing 24 JOINT PROPOSED Plan of Work by Sharieka Deal, Christopher Gaston, Paschall Truck Lines Inc, Leecindy Williams, American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order accepting Plan of Work)(aty,O'Neal, Byron) Modified filers on 1/17/2024 (Bunting, M).
January 8, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Removal Order filed by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co, Christopher Gaston, Paschall Truck Lines Inc, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Leecindy Williams. (aty,Anderson, Hillary) Modified on 1/8/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paschall Truck Lines Inc identifying Corporate Parent Paschall Truck Lines, Inc. for Paschall Truck Lines Inc. (aty,Anderson, Hillary)
January 5, 2024 Filing 21 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #15 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Matthew W Bailey on behalf of Paschall Truck Lines Inc. Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2024. (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 3, 2024 Filing 20 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paschall Truck Lines Inc. (aty,Anderson, Hillary)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/3/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 3, 2024 Filing 18 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Schaffer, Andrew)
January 3, 2024 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Schaffer, Andrew)
December 29, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Andrew E. Schaffer to Enroll as Counsel by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Andrew E Schaffer added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Schaffer, Andrew)
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #13 Answer to Complaint, sent to Matthew W Bailey on behalf of Paschall Truck Lines Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #13 Answer to Complaint, sent to Matthew W Bailey on behalf of Christopher Gaston, Paschall Truck Lines Inc, Leecindy Williams. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Christopher Gaston, Paschall Truck Lines Inc, Leecindy Williams.(Attorney Matthew W Bailey added to party Christopher Gaston(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Bailey added to party Paschall Truck Lines Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Bailey added to party Leecindy Williams(pty:dft))(aty,Bailey, Matthew)
December 18, 2023 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Christopher Gaston answer due 12/26/2023; Paschall Truck Lines Inc answer due 12/26/2023; Leecindy Williams answer due 12/26/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - NO PDF ATTACHED. See #12 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Certified Citation and Petition served on LeeCindy Williams, Christopher Gaston, Paschall Truck Lines, Inc. on December 5, 2023, filed by Sharieka Deal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accident Report, #2 Exhibit Service Letters with Certified Citation-Petition, #3 Exhibit Pictures of Envelopes-Mailing-Issuance, #4 Exhibit Delivery Receipts-Returns)(aty,O'Neal, Byron)
December 18, 2023 Filing 11 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharieka Deal. (aty,O'Neal, Byron)
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co. (aty,Anderson, Hillary)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co Risk Retention Group for American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co. (aty,Anderson, Hillary)
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 1/30/2024.)(crt,Roaix, G)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co.(aty,Anderson, Hillary)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 12/7/2023. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 12/5/2023. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/4/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Hillary Brouillette Anderson on behalf of American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co AND Byron O'Neal on behalf of Sharieka Deal. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Hillary Brouillette Anderson on behalf of American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 1, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 1, 2023 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co answer due 12/8/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - NO PDF ATTACHED, see #1 NOTICE of Removal, attachment #2. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 277762 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5780652) filed by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co Risk Retention Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Gretchen Graham, #4 Exhibit C-Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Hillary Brouillette Anderson added to party American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co Risk Retention Group(pty:dft))(aty,Anderson, Hillary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deal v. American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharieka Deal
Represented By: Byron O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paschall Truck Lines Inc
Represented By: Matthew W Bailey
Represented By: Katherine M Cook
Represented By: Catherine Ann Rutherford
Represented By: Hillary Brouillette Anderson
Represented By: Kennedy Maya Rose
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co Risk Retention Group
Represented By: Hillary Brouillette Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By: Andrew E Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gaston
Represented By: Matthew W Bailey
Represented By: Catherine Ann Rutherford
Represented By: Hillary Brouillette Anderson
Represented By: Katherine M Cook
Represented By: Kennedy Maya Rose
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leecindy Williams
Represented By: Catherine Ann Rutherford
Represented By: Hillary Brouillette Anderson
Represented By: Katherine M Cook
Represented By: Kennedy Maya Rose
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Represented By: Matthew W Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co
Represented By: Catherine Ann Rutherford
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Represented By: Hillary Brouillette Anderson
Represented By: Katherine M Cook
Represented By: Kennedy Maya Rose
Represented By: Matthew W Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?