Affiliated F M Insurance Cov. Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: Affiliated FM Insurance Company and Affiliated F M Insurance Co
Defendant: Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co., Inc., Admiral Insurance Company, Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc and Admiral Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2024cv00065
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jerry Edwards
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Affiliated F M Insurance Co. Admiral Insurance Co served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (aty,Orr, Jefferson)
March 4, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Affiliated F M Insurance Co. Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc served on 1/24/2024, answer due 2/14/2024. (aty,Orr, Jefferson)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties to follow the attached Scheduling Order that was entered into the lead case 23cv1294. A FOUR-DAY Bench Trial is set for 3/24/2025 at 9:00 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 2nd floor courtroom, before Judge Jerry Edwards Jr. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/12/2025 at 10:00 AM, in chambers, before Judge Jerry Edwards Jr. Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2025. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 3/28/2024. Witness List due by 11/29/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/29/2024. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/30/2024. Discovery deadline 12/28/2024. Expert Depositions due by 1/27/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2025. Daubert Motions due by 2/18/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 1/2/2025. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/15/2025. Motions in Limine due by 1/29/2025. Trial Depositions due by 1/15/2025. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 3/17/2025. Defendants witness list is due seven (7) days after receipt of plaintiffs list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 2/28/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
February 28, 2024 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY: A FOUR-DAY Bench Trial is set for 3/24/2025 at 9:00 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 2nd floor courtroom, before Judge Jerry Edwards Jr. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/12/2025 at 10:00 AM, in chambers, before Judge Jerry Edwards Jr. See attached minutes for the lead case 23cv1294. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 2/28/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc is granted an additional thirty (30) days within which to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/28/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 22, 2024 Cases associated. Create association to 1:23-cv-01294-JE-JPM. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Lead Case Number: 1:23-cv-1294. Member Case Number(s): 1:24-cv-0065. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/21/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 20, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #14 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 1:23-cv-01294-JE-JPM with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 16, 2024 Filing 16 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc. (aty,Voss, David)
February 16, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc. (aty,Voss, David)
February 16, 2024 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 1:23-cv-01294-JE-JPM with consent by Affiliated F M Insurance Co, Admiral Insurance Co, Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order granting Joint Motion to Consolidate)(aty,Welborn, Samuel) Modified to add filers on 2/16/2024 (Thomas, T). Modified on 2/20/2024 (Thomas, T).
February 14, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Answer to Complaint sent to Karl Howard Schmid on behalf of Admiral Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/28/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 14, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Answer to Complaint, sent to Karl Howard Schmid on behalf of Admiral Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/28/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 14, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to David C Voss on behalf of Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/28/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 14, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to David C Voss on behalf of Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/28/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 14, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Admiral Insurance Co.(Attorney Karl Howard Schmid added to party Admiral Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Schmid, Karl)
February 14, 2024 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Summons Issued - All, #1 Complaint,, with consent by Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time, #2 Exhibit Local Rule 7.4.1 Certificate)(Attorney David C Voss added to party Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Voss, David)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jefferson C Orr for Affiliated F M Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/25/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Jefferson C. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5835009) by Affiliated F M Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Jefferson C. Orr from USDC Middle District of TN, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jefferson C. Orr, #3 Proposed order Granting Motion to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Jefferson C. Orr)(aty,Welborn, Samuel)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/19/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (aty,Welborn, Samuel)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (aty,Welborn, Samuel)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Admiral Insurance Co, Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Admiral Insurance Co, Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5829382) filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to be issued to Defendant Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co., Inc., #3 Proposed Summons to be issued to Defendant Admiral Insurance Company)(Attorney Samuel J Welborn added to party Affiliated FM Insurance Company(pty:pla))(aty,Welborn, Samuel) Modified on 1/18/2024 (Thomas, T).
January 18, 2024 CASE Assigned to District Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affiliated F M Insurance Cov. Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel J Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affiliated F M Insurance Co
Represented By: Samuel J Welborn
Represented By: Jefferson C Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Roofing & Sheet Metal Co Inc
Represented By: David C Voss
Represented By: David W Carley
Represented By: Edwin Allen Graves, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Co
Represented By: Karl Howard Schmid
Represented By: David Inge Clay, II
Represented By: Kimberly B Ward
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?