Thompson v. Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Bonnie Thompson
Defendant: Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc and Newsleader Inc
Case Number: 2:2008cv00125
Filed: January 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Beauregard
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2009 Filing 36 USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (certified copy) as to 33 Notice of Appeal filed by Bonnie Thompson that the appeal is DISMISSED for lack of timely filing of notice of appeal. (crt,Lundy, N)
December 30, 2008 Filing 35 CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 33 Notice of Appeal ( 1 Volumes of Records). Paper record on appeal held in District Clerk's office. (crt,LundySld, N)
November 21, 2008 Filing 34 USCA Case Number 08-31126 for 33 Notice of Appeal filed by Bonnie Thompson. (crt,McInnis, S)
November 10, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 31 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Bonnie Thompson. FEE STATUS: PAID. Appeal Record due by 11/25/2008. (crt,Lundy, N)
November 10, 2008 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 54635015329 (crt,Putch, A)
October 30, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address by William H Eckert. (crt,Williams, L)
October 3, 2008 Filing 31 JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Strike (the motion is granted to the extent that the Court will strike from the Affidavit of Bonnie Thompson; otherwise, the motion is denied) ; granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/03/08. (crt,Williams, L)
October 3, 2008 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM RULING re 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc, 26 MOTION to Strike filed by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/03/08. (crt,Williams, L)
October 1, 2008 Filing 29 MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to a request by the parties the 22 Pretrial Telephone Conference currently set for October 9, 2008 is hereby rescheduled for Friday, October 10, 2008 @ 10:30 AM before Judge James T Trimble Jr.(crt,Benoit, T)
September 30, 2008 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Strike filed by Bonnie Thompson. (aty,Iles, Randall)
September 30, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion Referred to Chambers to be considered at motion setting regarding 26 MOTION to Strike. Motion day set for 10/8/2008 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Williams, L)
September 29, 2008 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed as 26 Motion to Strike. Counsel is reminded that multiple pleadings should not be combined into one document, but should be filed separately. (crt,Williams, L) Modified on 9/30/2008 to assign document number(Williams, L).
September 29, 2008 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order, # 2 Memorandum / Brief, # 3 Exhibits, # 4 Exhibits, # 5 Exhibits, # 6 Exhibits, # 7 Exhibits, # 8 Exhibits)(aty,Jones, Robin) Modified on 9/30/2008 to edit text (Williams, L).
September 19, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding 23 First MOTION in Limine. Motion day set for 11/12/2008 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 18, 2008 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Robin Lynn Jones on behalf of Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc regarding 24 Exhibits. Action taken: Modified text to reflect pleading filed is not a motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 18, 2008 Filing 24 EXHIBITS re 23 First MOTION in Limine by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. (aty,Jones, Robin) Modified to more accurately reflect pleading filed on 9/19/2008. (Alexander, E)
September 18, 2008 Filing 23 First MOTION in Limine by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order, # 2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Jones, Robin)
September 16, 2008 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY: At the request of defense counsel, Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2008 10:30 AM before Judge James T Trimble Jr. Mr William H Eckert will initiate the call to include all parties. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 16, 2008 Filing 21 FAXED LETTER dated 9/16/2008 from William H Eckert to Judge James T Trimble, Jr requesting a pretrial conference be scheduled. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 16, 2008 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bonnie Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of material facts, # 2 Exhibits, # 3 Exhibits, # 4 Exhibits)(aty,Iles, Randall)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER striking 14 DEFICIENT Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/9/08. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 19, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion day set for 10/8/2008 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Williams, L)
August 19, 2008 Filing 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order, # 2 Statement of material facts, # 3 Memorandum / Brief, # 4 Exhibits, # 5 Exhibits, # 6 Exhibits, # 7 Exhibits, # 8 Exhibits, # 9 Exhibits, # 10 Exhibits, # 11 Exhibits, # 12 Exhibits)(aty,Jones, Robin)
June 4, 2008 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc regarding 14 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Compel, 16 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Notice of Hearing. Action taken: docket entry modified to reflect submission as a Corrective Document entitled Notice of Hearing (electronically filed as Proposed Order/Judgment). The motion to compel remains deficient as a proposed order has not been received as required by LR37.1W. (crt,Williams, L)
June 4, 2008 Filing 16 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Notice of Hearing by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc re 14 Motion to Compel,. (aty,Ungarino, Matthew) Modified on 6/5/2008 to more accurately reflect name of document(Williams, L).
May 27, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency to Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc regarding 14 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Compel. Reason: No proposed order accompanied this discovery motion. LR37.1W requires that A proposed order shall accompany each motion filed under this paragraph. (crt,Williams, L)
May 23, 2008 STRICKEN MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as doc 14 Motion to Compel was electronically filed without selecting all reliefs requested in pleading. (crt,Williams, L) Modified to reflect motion is stricken on 9/10/2008. See 19 Order. (Alexander, E)
May 23, 2008 Filing 14 (STRICKEN) DEFICIENT MOTION to Compel by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum / Brief # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4Exhibit C)(aty,Ungarino, Matthew) Modified on 5/27/2008 to reflect submission as Deficient (Williams, L). Modified to reflect pleading is stricken on 9/10/2008. See 19 Order. (Alexander, E)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL FIXING ORDER: Jury Trial is hereby set for 11/17/2008 beginning at 09:30 AM in Lake Charles, courtroom 1 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. The parties are cautioned that no motion for continuance will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Neither the fact that the parties are not prepared for trial nor the fact that all parties agree to a continuance will be considered as constituting good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/8/2008. (crt,Carter, Cassie)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney William H Eckert for Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc and Newsleader Inc, Kelly Elizabeth Heinen for Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc and Newsleader Inc. Attorney David Ira Bordelon and Matthew J Ungarino terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/21/08. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 16, 2008 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute William H Eckert and Libby Heinen in place of Matthew J Ungarino as Attorney and to Designate Trial Attorney by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Eckert, William) Modified to more accurately reflect title of document on 4/17/2008. (Alexander, E)
April 14, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency to William H Eckert on behalf of Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc regarding 9 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Substitute Attorney William H. Eckert - Trial Attorney. Reason: Original signatures of both the attorney withdrawing and of the attorney enrolling are required pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. (crt,Williams, L)
April 11, 2008 Filing 9 DEFICIENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney William H. Eckert - Trial Attorney by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Eckert, William) Modified on 4/14/2008 to reflect submission as Deficient. (Williams, L) Modified on 4/17/2008 to remove "?" from docket text. Motion resubmitted in its entirety and filed as document 11 . (Alexander, E)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2008 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments to scheduling order)(crt,Benoit, T)
February 25, 2008 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc - 28 USC 1447(c) Submission. (aty,Eckert, William)
February 25, 2008 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc identifying Corporate Parent Gatehouse Media, Inc. for Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc. (aty,Eckert, William)
February 25, 2008 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc.(aty,Eckert, William)
February 20, 2008 FILING FEE: on behalf of Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc in the amount of $350.00, receipt number 54635011171 (crt,Luce, Tori)
February 15, 2008 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Newsleader Inc identifying Corporate Parent Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc for Newsleader Inc.. (aty,Beach, Bruce)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mildred E Methvin on 2/6/08. (crt,Whidden, C)
February 1, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to David Ira Bordelon, Matthew J Ungarino on behalf of Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc, Newsleader Inc. (crt,Dunford, T)
January 29, 2008 CASE assigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dunford, T)
January 29, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 36th JDC (Beauregard), Case Number C2008-0012 filed by Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holding Inc, Newsleader Inc. (Attachments: # 1 State court petition, # 2 State court notice, # 3 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Thompson
Represented By: Randall Scott Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatehouse Media Louisiana Holdings Inc
Represented By: Matthew J Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newsleader Inc
Represented By: Matthew J Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?