Case name not on file

Case Number: 2:2010cv01729
Filed: November 16, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims of additional damage. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 12/22/11. (crt,Finn, P)
April 29, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding 11 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 10 Memorandum Ruling. The undersigned hereby adopts the report and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly it is ORDERED that the 2 Motion to Remand is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/29/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 22, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 2 MOTION to Remand filed by Chuck Styron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on February 22, 2011. (crt,Benoit, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?