Malbroux v. American Medical Systems Inc

Plaintiff: Wilbert Malbroux, Jr
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc and James J Jancuska
Case Number: 2:2011cv00421
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by American Medical Systems Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 8/29/11. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 11, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER denying 45 Motion for Recusal as to both judges. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 8/10/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 21, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 22 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that defendant, Dr. James J. Jancuska be and is hereby DISMIISED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/21/11. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 31, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/31/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malbroux v. American Medical Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Malbroux, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Quentin F Urquhart, Jr
Represented By: Stephen G A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J Jancuska
Represented By: John Gregory Bergstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?